Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez Estanislao Gomez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mazza Steven L. Esq., Miller Eleanor L. Esq., against Alcazar Ana Lidia Robles, Avalos Jose Antonio Sanchez, Avalos Juan Sanchez, Does 1 To 10, Gonzalez Amelia, (total of 8) See All represented by Dan D. Endoso & Associates, Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar Law O O, Rosser David B. Esq., Dunkin Craig L. Esq., Reisinger Robert L. Esq., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 28, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial905 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions387 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time973 days |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Ana Lidia Robles Alcazar (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Estanislao Gomez Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by: Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Other - Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Attorney of Record's Unavailability; Filed by: Global Financial Partners, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Associated Counsel
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Estanislao Gomez Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Trial Brief RE: JURY'S ROLE IN DETERMINING SUBSTANTIAL FACTOR; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Brief civil deposit legacy; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Reply reply in support of motion to tax costs; Filed by: Ana Lidia Robles Alcazar (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Special Verdict Form; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions Refused/Withdrawn; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Video Deposition Of Dr. Kamron Nourgostar Played During Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Objection To Proposed Judgment; Filed by: Ana Lidia Robles Alcazar (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Order tentative ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: November 03, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 10, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 03, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: November 16, 2016ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE: COURT ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC
Date: September 06, 2017ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS
Date: January 10, 2018NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS
Date: February 05, 2018PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 ETC.
Date: September 14, 2018PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE MENTION OF DEFENSE DOCTORS AS "INDEPENDENT"; ETC.
Date: September 14, 2018PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 ETC.
Date: September 14, 2018PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 ETC.
Date: September 14, 2018PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 ETC.
Date: September 14, 2018PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 ETC.
Date: September 14, 2018PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 ETC.
Date: September 14, 2018Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 28, 2018Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONTO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: February 08, 2019Reply - Reply reply in support of motion to tax costs
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: February 25, 2019ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY; ETC.
Date: February 09, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2017Summons
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Notice (OF FIRST LIEN RIGHTS OF EMPLOYER; REQUEST FOR SERVICE; NOTICE OF CREDIT RIGHTS )
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Notice, Association of Counsel
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Notice, Association of Counsel
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED JORGE ROBLES )
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Cross-complaint ( OF IRMA AND CESAREO CHAIRES DISMISSED )
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Lien Claimant
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT COMPLAINT AS TO IRMA CHAIRES, AND CESAREO CHAIRES ONLY )
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Notice (OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 631(b) AND DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Receipt (jury fees )
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPP TO MTN TO CONT TRIAL )
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Reply/Response (REPLY IN SUPP OF MTN TO CONT TRIAL AND REL DATES 9528 )
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Order (RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE COURT ORDER GRATING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC )
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 )
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Motion to Quash (MTN TO QUASH 170927254509 11/17/2017 01:30 pm )
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPP TO PLTF MTN TO QSH SUBPOENA )
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash ( 171025261420 1/10/2018 01:30 pm )
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPP TO PLTF MTN TO QSH )
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPP TO MTN TO QSH )
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPP MTN TO QSH )
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (MTN TO QSH DEPO )
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Order (RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS )
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND ALL RELATED DATES )
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 TO PRECLUDE SURVEILLANCE (SUBROSA) TAKEN OF PLNTIFF; )
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO EXCLUDE IMPROPER EXPERT OPINION FROM LAY WTNESSES; )
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Brief (TRIAL RE: PEOPLE v. SANCHEZ )
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOTION IN LIMINE NO.7 TO EXCLUDE MENTION OF DEFENSE DOCTORS AS 'INDEPENDENT'; )
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIM1NE NO.3
Date: September 18, 2018DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.7; DECLARATION OF EDYE A. HILL
Date: September 18, 2018DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8
Date: September 18, 2018DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: September 18, 2018DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: September 18, 2018DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAIITIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: September 18, 2018DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6
Date: September 18, 2018DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: September 19, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO TRIAL BRIEF )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#2 TO PRECLUDE REPTILE THEORY )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT WITNESS LIST )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 )
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice (of Attorney of Record's Unavailability)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Order (TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER )
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Affidavit - misc (ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6) )
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial / Short-Cause))
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Other - (TRIAL BRIEF RE: JURY'S ROLE IN DETERMINING SUBSTANTIAL FACTOR)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial / Short-Cause))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Video Deposition Of Dr. Kamron Nourgostar Played During Trial)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Refused/Withdrawn)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Trial Brief (Defendant's Trial Brief Regarding The Substantial Cause Issue For Jury Consideration)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial / Short-Cause))
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Special Verdict (Form)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONTO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Other - (Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/08/2019)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Reply (reply in support of motion to tax costs)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Objection (To Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Order (tentative ruling)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice (notice of court order granting in part and denying in part)
Date: February 28, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.