Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Green Gabriel, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Minna Dennis Frank, against Agulnek M.D. An Individual Robert M., David M. Grossman M.D. Medical, David M. Grossman M.D. Medical Corp., Dmg Personalized Medicine Inc. A California Corporation, Does 1 To 100, (total of 10) See All represented by Browne George Ross Llp, Schmid & Voiles, Cayley John Stafford, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management1304 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions829 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc North West Dist. |
Case Cycle Time1703 days |
Summons Filed (ON CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: DAVID M. GROSSMAN, M.D., MEDICAL CORPORATION )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: DMG PERSONALIZED MEDICINE )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: SOUTH VALLEY PHYSICIAN GROUP )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: KIM K (AGENT FOR DEFENDANT) )
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: SIGNATURE MD, INC. )
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Summons Filed (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (NADIA MENDOZA, ATTORNEY FOR DEFEN- DANT )
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: MICHAEL TENOFSKY, M.D. )
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00First Amended Complaint (CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Order (Amended Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Corrected Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Sustaining Demurrer)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiffs Amended and Supers...))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: Sanctions) of and Order re: Fee Waiver)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Order-Court Fee Waiver
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Amended Judgment
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re: Declaration of Charles C. Choe, M.D.; Exhibit)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA: B305825)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Waiver)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Motion re: (Relief from Waiver)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial/Discovery and to set Motions for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation ()
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment and of Order For Plaintiff to Give Notice)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration; Hearing on Motion for ...))
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B312055, NA04.05.2021; PER 8.140(b))
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Court to Allow and Consid...))
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Appeal Document (B312055, ; DCA order re: Application for extension of time)
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Objection (to Court's Order Sustaining Defendants Objection)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice (of intent to Move to set Aside)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Applicat...) of )
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF/ORDERS AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Dismiss Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice (Order Continuing All Hearings Set for July 11, 2019 Due to Plaintiff's Illness)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Reconsidera...))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment))
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Request (for Court Reporting Services By a Party with a Fee Waiver)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment) of )
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA: B3102055)
Date: May 25, 2021Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA )
Date: August 03, 2021Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U")
Date: April 16, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B312055)
Date: November 18, 2021Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings) of )
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Arash Bereliani, M.D.)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Other - (Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Response to Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B312055)
Date: January 04, 2022Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION BY PLAINTIFF TO THE COURTS E-MAILING OF TENTATIVE RULING ON 8-14-19; EXHIBIT)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's ex parte application))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of (1) defend...))
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Order (Court's Order Re Ex Parte Communications)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Applicat...))
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service -
Date: December 29, 2017Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 26, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: October 30, 2017Proof of Service by Mail -
Date: November 20, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: December 19, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof of Service
Date: May 24, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: July 01, 2019Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: May 24, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: May 24, 2018Notice of Motion -
Date: July 17, 2018Motion to Compel -
Date: July 26, 2018Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS
Date: August 07, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion-Strike
Date: September 13, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike)
Date: October 25, 2018Order - Order Court's ruling on motion
Date: October 25, 2018Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: November 27, 2018Motion for Reconsideration
Date: January 25, 2019Motion re: - Motion re: Relief from Waiver
Date: January 29, 2019Notice - Notice Notice of Errata Re: Motion for Reconsideration
Date: January 31, 2019Other - - OTHER - RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 19, 2019Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: December 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: December 19, 2019Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO VACATE 10/25/18 ORDER
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT (CCP 473))
Date: January 24, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: March 12, 2020Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: August 26, 2020Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Relief from Waiver of Di...))
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Appear by Telephone)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice (Request for Court Reporting Services by a Party with Fee Waiver (LACIV269))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (MICHAEL VINCENT LAMB)
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Objection (To Plaintiff's Notice of Intention to Move for a New Trial)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Order (Court's ruling on motion)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF VARIOUS HEARINGS)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion(RFPs))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Deborah L. Stough, CSR #8925)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Trial/Discovery and set Moti...))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Objection (To Plaintiff's Late Filed Memorandum in Support of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00SUMMONS ON CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 23, 2017Notice
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: DMG PERSONALIZED MEDICINE INC )
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Notice (OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION )
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for (1) emergency...))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: DAVID M. GROSSMAN, M.D. )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE (NOVEMBER 7,2017) )
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Objection (To Plaintiff's Late Filed Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (ERIC MARC GEORGE)
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendants Michael Tenofsky, M.D., David M. Grossman, M.D., M...))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U" Appeal)
Date: April 05, 2021Minute order entered: 2018-01-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Order (Sustaining Defendants' Objection to Continuance of Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order of )
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Request (for Court Reporting Services By a Party with a Fee Waiver)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATIONS RE MEET AND CONFER RE (NON-FILED) MOTION TO STRIKE DEMURRER )
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Request-Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Request for Accommodations by Persons with Disabilities and Response])
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION TO COURT ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS OBJECTION, ETC)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Order (Continuing Various Dates Re: Pending Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Objection (to Court's Order)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing on Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Josslyn Gordon, CSR# 10284))
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Response to Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Request (for Court Reporting Services by a Party With Fee Waiver)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE OSC RE DISMISSAL )
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Defendants Michael Tenofsky, ...))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Reconsidera...) of )
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Declaration (RE SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Hearing and Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Other - (RULING ON: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MSJ's SET )
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion for New Trial, Order Denying Leave to File Late Papers (Ex Parte Application))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON HIS MOTION TO TAX COSTS OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's ex parte application) of )
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer (AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Order (ON MOTION TO VACATE ORDER)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B305825)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE: CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B305825)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Objection (FURTHER OBJECTION BY PLAINTIFF TO THE COURTS TENTATIVE RULING OF ; EXHIBIT)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re Dr Declaration of Charles C. Choe, M.D.; Exhibit)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Order (on Motion to Amend Judgment)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Order - ORDER CONTINUING VARIOUS DATES RE: PENDING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: October 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: November 25, 2020Other - - Summons On First Amended Complaint (SUM-100A and SUM-200A)
Date: September 25, 2017DECLARATION OF GABRIEL GREEN RE: SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; EXHIBITS A-D.
Date: October 23, 2017NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: December 22, 2017Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATIONS RE MEET AND CONFER RE (NON-FILED) MOTION TO STRIKE DEMURRER )
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (ERIC MARC GEORGE)
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (MICHAEL VINCENT LAMB)
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice-Demurrer
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment and of Order For Plaintiff to Give Notice)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Appear by Telephone)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Corrected Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Deborah L. Stough, CSR #8925)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Order (Court's ruling on motion)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Motion-Strike
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants Opposition)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata Re: Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Sanctions))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Reply - Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion(RFPs)
Date: February 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF DI...)
Date: February 25, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: March 15, 2019Motion for Reconsideration
Date: March 21, 2019Motion for Reconsideration
Date: March 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: March 28, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER
Date: March 29, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 30, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: May 06, 2019Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: May 13, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: May 14, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: May 14, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 07, 2019Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: June 27, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 28, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO DISMISS OFF CALENDAR
Date: July 08, 2019Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial/Discovery and to set Motions for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Trial/Discovery and set Moti...))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Request (for Court Reporting Services By a Party with a Fee Waiver)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Sanctions))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Order (re: Sanctions)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Motion re: (Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief from Waiver of Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Motion re: (Relief from Waiver)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Sustaining Demurrer)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata Re: Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice (Request for Court Reporting Services by a Party with Fee Waiver (LACIV269))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Request (for Court Reporting Services by Party with Fee Waiver)
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Dismiss Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice (Order Continuing All Hearings Set for July 11, 2019 Due to Plaintiff's Illness)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration; Hearing on Motion for ...))
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Objection (To Plaintiff's Late Filed Memorandum in Support of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings) of 07/24/2019)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Hearing and Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's ex parte application))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Objection (To Plaintiff's Late Filed Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Court to Allow and Consid...))
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Applicat...))
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion for New Trial, Order Denying Leave to File Late Papers (Ex Parte Application))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION BY PLAINTIFF TO THE COURTS E-MAILING OF TENTATIVE RULING ON 8-14-19; EXHIBIT)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Objection (FURTHER OBJECTION BY PLAINTIFF TO THE COURTS TENTATIVE RULING OF 8/14/19; EXHIBIT)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Reconsidera...))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 08/27/2019)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/27/2019)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of (1) defend...))
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re Dr Declaration of Charles C. Choe, M.D.; Exhibit)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/12/2019)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re: Declaration of Charles C. Choe, M.D.; Exhibit)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Other - (RULING ON: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MSJ's SET 12/19/19)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiffs Amended and Supers...))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Response to Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Other - (Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Response to Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Arash Bereliani, M.D.)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/23/2020)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Order (Court's Order Re Ex Parte Communications)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Order (ON MOTION TO VACATE 10/25/18 ORDER)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for (1) emergency...))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 22, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 18, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 23, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Notice (OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION )
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Summons Filed (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00First Amended Complaint (CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (RE SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Summons Filed (ON CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: SOUTH VALLEY PHYSICIAN GROUP )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: DMG PERSONALIZED MEDICINE )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: DAVID M. GROSSMAN, M.D. )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: DAVID M. GROSSMAN, M.D., MEDICAL CORPORATION )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: DMG PERSONALIZED MEDICINE INC )
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: SIGNATURE MD, INC. )
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: MICHAEL TENOFSKY, M.D. )
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE (NOVEMBER 7,2017) )
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE: CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer (AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (NADIA MENDOZA, ATTORNEY FOR DEFEN- DANT )
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: KIM K (AGENT FOR DEFENDANT) )
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE OSC RE DISMISSAL )
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendants Michael Tenofsky, M.D., David M. Grossman, M.D., M...))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Defendants Michael Tenofsky, ...))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 04/20/20 B305825)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA: 04/20/20 B305825)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Order (on Motion to Amend Judgment)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON HIS MOTION TO TAX COSTS OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment) of 10/05/2020)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment))
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Order (Continuing Various Dates Re: Pending Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion(RFPs))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Objection (To Plaintiff's Notice of Intention to Move for a New Trial)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Josslyn Gordon, CSR# 10284))
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Relief from Waiver of Di...))
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Order (Amended Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Request for Accommodations by Persons with Disabilities and Response])
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants Opposition)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Waiver)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's March 4, 2019 Order)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Request (for Court Reporting Services By a Party with a Fee Waiver)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/16/2019)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF VARIOUS HEARINGS)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation (6/7/2019)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Objection (to Court's Order)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Objection (to Court's Order Sustaining Defendants Objection)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)))
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION TO COURT ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS OBJECTION, ETC)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing on Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Request (for Court Reporting Services by a Party With Fee Waiver)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.