Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mayo Sociedad Mutualista Cinco De, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Keller Edwing Frank, against Acevedo Rosa Margarita, Avila Jaime Romo, Enriquez Carlos, Hernandez America, Hernandez Patricia, (total of 6) See All represented by Novodor Alan Gene Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management1195 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial489 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions159 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sociedad Mutualista (Cinco De Mayo) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sociedad Mutualista (Cinco De Mayo) (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Joint Bankruptcy Report; Filed by: Sociedad Mutualista (Cinco De Mayo) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sociedad Mutualista (Cinco De Mayo) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Clerk; After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sociedad Mutualista (Cinco De Mayo) (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: July 13, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 13, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Frist Class-Mail
Date: December 24, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 11, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 04, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 26, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 05, 2020DEPARTMENT 53 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS
Date: August 22, 2016ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION AND RELATED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2016NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION
Date: December 13, 2016DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 ETC.
Date: January 26, 2017DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 ETC.
Date: January 26, 2017DEFENDANTS' PRETRIAL MOTIONS CHART (MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: January 27, 2017PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #2 ETC.
Date: February 10, 2017OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: May 23, 2017DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF FACTS ALLEGED BY CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: May 11, 2017Complaint
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-16 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-04 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Status Conference;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Stay Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Court Attendant
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Carlos Enriquez (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Joint Bankruptcy Report
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference;))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference;) of 11/16/2018)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to Recusal))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Frist Class-Mail
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (against Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re continuation of the hearing set...))
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuation of the hearing date set for 4/22...))
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference and OSC re: Dismissal)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: continuation of the 2/28/20 he...))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.