Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RHODIER CESAR VS SANDRA PEREZ ET AL
On April 06, 2015 a fraud (no contract) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Samantha Jessner presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 06, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 19, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Mark A. Borenstein;Category
Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 months and 18 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Silvio Nardoni (Attorney) |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Address for Silvio Nardoni (Attorney) updated | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Silvio Nardoni (Attorney): Middle Name: blank | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Silvio Nardoni (Attorney) Filed by Silvio Nardoni (Attorney) |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Silvio Nardoni (Attorney) |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | SERVICE TICKET - ARREST | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-10-03 00:00:00 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) - Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) - |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng Mark A\. Borenstein 1:30 pm | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-10-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-10-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) - |
|
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Writ of Execution filed Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Filed by Clerk |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) - Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) - |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-08-29 00:00:00 | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng Mark A\. Borenstein 1:30 pm | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-08-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) - |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-08-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 08, 2016 | Proof of Service - | ||
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) - Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) - |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng Mark A\. Borenstein 1:30 pm | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-06-17 00:00:00 | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-06-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2016-06-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) - |
|
April 07, 2016 | hearing | Calendaring:Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng Mark A\. Borenstein | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Stay Filed by: Debtor of Judgment Debtor |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Order to Appear for Examination Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Debtor of Judgment Debtor Filed by Debtor of Judgment Debtor |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Debtor of Judgment Debtor |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff Filed by Plaintiff |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Creditor |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Writ issued Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SILVIO NARDONI RE POST JUDGMENT ACCRUED INTEREST IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Creditor |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Clerk |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl. 231 Days | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-11-23 00:00:00 | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; OSC Discharged) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; OSC Discharged) - |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Samantha P. Jessner 8:30 am | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RHODIER CESAR IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SILVIO NARDONI IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-11-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; OSC Discharged) - |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-11-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
October 23, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Samantha P. Jessner | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Samantha P. Jessner 8:30 am | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-10-23 00:00:00 | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-10-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-10-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Unknown Event Type |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-10-06 00:00:00 | |
October 06, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Samantha P. Jessner | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Samantha P. Jessner 8:30 am | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-10-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-10-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Samantha P. Jessner 8:30 am | |
August 04, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Samantha P. Jessner | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2015-08-04 00:00:00 | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-08-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2015-08-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Statement of Damages Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof-Service/Summons | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENTS OF DAMAGES | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF DAMAGES TO DEFENDANTS | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof-Service/Summons | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof-Service/Summons | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof-Service/Summons | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 10, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Samantha P. Jessner | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Fraud (no contract) | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT 1. FRAUD BY MISREPRESENTATION; ETC | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Rhodier Cesar (Plaintiff) |
|