Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gonzales Franciso, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Boyamian Michael Hagop, Falvey Thomas Walker, Kizirian Armand Raffi, against Arcadia Transit Inc. Dba Blackcar La A California Corporation, Southland Transit Inc., San Gabriel Transit Inc., represented by Desantis Kevin Val, Dixon Christine Yoon, Lebow Bradley Aaron, Mcfaul James Alexander Jr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maren Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaren Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2014 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: January 05, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 06, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 15, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2022Motion to Consolidate - MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES
Date: September 01, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES
Date: September 22, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES
Date: January 11, 2022Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Objection to Dawn Boulden Declaration; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration of Armand R. Kizirian; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-05T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other Reversed and remanded with directions. B282377; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Summons Issued Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Class Certification Filed by null
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address and Other Contact Information; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 01, 2023Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Order Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Reply in Support of Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-02-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-11-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-05-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 30, 2023Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Objection to Ray Mundy Declarations; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by null
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Objection to Stacey Murphy Declarations; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Joint; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Order Deny Class Certification Filed by Court
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Further Status Conference; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Cases; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Order Deny Class Certification; Signed and Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Appeal - Augmented Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff); San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff); San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-03-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Rulings on Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Joined Party
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-08-04T00:00:00Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Brief Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00Motion Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other (Reversed and remanded with directions. B282377) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Status Conference Statement (Joint) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff); San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Further Status Conference Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (SUPPLEMENTAL) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Consolidate Cases) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Armand R. Kizirian) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Objection (to Dawn Boulden Declaration) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Objection (to Stacey Murphy Declarations) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Rulings on Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: February 01, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: January 30, 2023Rulings on Plaintiff's Objections to the Declarations of Ray A. Mundy Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Plaintiff Francisco Gonzales' Class Action Trial Management Plan Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Response (to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Reply in Support of Renewed Motion for Class Certification Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Rulings on Plaintiff's Objections to the Declarations of Stacey Murphy Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of dates in l...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Class Certification)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Rulings on Plaintiff's Objections to the Declaration of Dawn Boulden Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Order (Denying Defendant's Motion to Consolidate) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Objection (to Ray Mundy Declarations) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-08-04T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Legacy
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service by Moving Party Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Response Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 25, 2022Order - ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: January 25, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: May 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION)
Date: October 14, 2022Order - ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: December 29, 2022Order - RULINGS ON EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: December 29, 2022Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service by Moving Party Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal; Filed by: Legacy
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-03-10T00:00:00Evidentiary Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification; Filed by: Legacy
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Appellant
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Further Status Conference; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Rulings on Plaintiff's Objections to the Declaration of Dawn Boulden; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Appeal - Augmented Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Order (Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Armand R. Kizirian) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-03-03 00:00:00
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2014-08-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-05-29 00:00:00
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-30 00:00:00
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-19 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-11-19T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address and Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Evidentiary Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Order Deny Class Certification
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Notice to Report to Prepare Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Further Status Conference
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Status Conference Statement (Joint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Augmented Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice (of Further Status Conference)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Related Case) of 12/15/2020)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Case))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation Continuing Dates in Light of Scheduled Mediation)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation Continuing Dates in Light of Scheduled Mediation)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other (Reversed and remanded with directions. B282377)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Armand R. Kizirian)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Court Order Following August 26, 2021, Further Status Conference
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate (Cases)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Consolidate Cases)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of dates in l...))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling on Joint Ex Parte Application of Continuance of Dates)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice to Report to Prepare Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Joined Party
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Declaration of Armand R. Kizirian; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Rulings on Plaintiff's Objections to the Declarations of Ray A. Mundy; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Rulings on Plaintiff's Objections to the Declarations of Stacey Murphy; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Response to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections; Filed by: Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-03-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Notice to Report to Prepare Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Evidentiary Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Filed by null
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: San Gabriel Transit, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice (of Further Status Conference) Filed by Franciso Gonzales (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-02-27T00:00:00Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.