Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALFRED MCKNIGHT VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA ET AL
On November 30, 2010 an other employment complaint case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Teresa Sanchez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 04, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Owen Lee Kwong; Zaven V. Sinanian; Michael P. Linfield; Rex Heeseman; Charles F. Palmer; Victor E. Chavez;Judge
Hon. Teresa Sanchez
Category
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Case Outcome Type
Jury Verdict
Status
Trial Verdict
Case Duration
3 years, 3 months and 24 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Description
Probationary driver separated after driving incidents: defense
Jury Vote
Case Type(s)
- Employment; Failure to Accommodate
Demand
Verdict Type
Verdict-Defendant
Offer
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Remittitur Filed by: Clerk | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk |
|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONDENTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONDENTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE) | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE) | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMO OF COSTS | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Court | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ON PARTIAL DIRECTED VERDICT, AND ON SPECIAL VERDICT | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Court |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED JUJDGEMENT ON PARTIAL DIRECTED VERDICT, AND ON SPECIAL VERDICT | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Jury Question Filed by: Court | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-03-25 00:00:00 | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Verdict Reached) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Verdict Reached) - |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Victor E\. Chavez | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Court | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Court | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Verdict 1211 Days | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Question Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Special Verdict Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | JURY QUESIJON | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | SPECIAL VERDICT | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION, RECEIPT AND ORDER RE RELEASE OF CIVIL EXHIBITS | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Verdict-Special Filed by: Court | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Court |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Verdict Reached) - |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Question Filed by Court |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Special Verdict Filed by Court |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Court |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Victor E\. Chavez | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-03-24 00:00:00 | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-03-21 00:00:00 | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Reconsideration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Victor E\. Chavez | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS Motion for Reconsideration OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO AMEND PLEADINGS TO CONFORM TO PROOF; [PROPOSED] FIRST AMENDED ANSWER; DECLARATION | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Victor E\. Chavez | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-03-20 00:00:00 | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-03-19 00:00:00 | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Victor E\. Chavez | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Victor E\. Chavez | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-03-18 00:00:00 | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Start of Trial) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Start of Trial) - |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Court | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Start of Trial) - |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Court |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Trial Teresa Sanchez-Gordon 10:00 am | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 17, 2014 | hearing | Calendaring:Jury Trial Victor E\. Chavez | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Victor E\. Chavez | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Court) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Court) - |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-03-17 00:00:00 | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 (Trial; Transferred to different departmnt) - (Trial; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 96 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Court) - |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 (Trial; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 5 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 4 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 3 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 2 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 1 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 4 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 5 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 3 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 1 ETC. | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 2 ETC. | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice OF DEFENDANTS CITY OF SANTA MONICA AND ADOLFO ERNESTO CREPSO | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | OMNIBUS DECLARATION OF BERTA A. BLEN, IN SUPPOORT OF PLAIN11FFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-5 | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 4 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN UMINE TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS PAST WORKERS COMPENSATION CLAIMS; Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 2 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF NEGATIVE PERFORMANCE, ACCIDENTS AND/OR INCIDENTS INVOLVING PLAINTIFF, OTHER THAN THOSE TAKING PLACE ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 9, 2009; MEMORANDUM OF PO | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 3 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF NEGATIVE PERFORMANCE, ACCIDENTS AND/OR INCIDENTS INVOLVING PLAINTIFF WHILE EMPLOYED AT TIJMBLEWEEDS; Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 5 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS PAST HARRASSMENT LAWSUIT AGAINST FORMER EMPLOYER MTA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 1 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE SUPPORTING DEFENSES NOT PROPERLY PLED AND/OR NOT RAISED DURING PRE-TRIAL LITIGATION; Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Big Blue Bus Lines (Legacy Party) Filed by Big Blue Bus Lines (Legacy Party) |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Big Blue Bus Lines (Legacy Party) |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing | Calendaring:Trial Teresa Sanchez-Gordon | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIM1NE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE REGARDING GRIEVANCES FILED WITH CITY BY OR ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 22, 2009 | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Trial Teresa Sanchez-Gordon 10:00 am | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion in Limine NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE REGARDING ALLEGED RACE DISCRIMINATION OR WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Big Blue Bus Lines (Legacy Party) Filed by Big Blue Bus Lines (Legacy Party) |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion in Limine NO. 3 | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-02-24 00:00:00 | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Unknown Event Type - Held Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 1 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AN]) Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE SUPPORTING DEFENSES NOT PROPERLY PLED AND/OR NOT RAISED DURING PRE-TRIAL LITIGATION; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION OF RUPERT A. | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Big Blue Bus Lines (Legacy Party) |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS Motion in Limine NO. 1 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AN]) Motion in Limine TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE SUPPORTING DEFENSES NOT PROPERLY PLED AND/OR NOT RAISED DURING PRE-TRIAL LITIGATION; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION OF RUPERT A. | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXI-IIBITS BY PLAINTIFF ALFRED MCKNIGHT | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | JOINT TRIAL WITNESS LIST | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Jury Instructions Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | JOINT LIST OF REQUESTED Jury Instructions AND VERDICT FORM(S) PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED CACI AND SPECIAL Jury Instructions; DEFENDANTS PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Jury Instructions Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS LIST OF REQUESTED Jury Instructions AND VERDICT FORM(S) | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS LIST OF REQUESTED Jury Instructions AND VERDICT FORM(S) | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-02-13 00:00:00 | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Mandatory Settlement Conference Rex Heeseman 9:00 am | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
February 06, 2014 | hearing | Calendaring:Mandatory Settlement Conference Rex Heeseman | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Trial Teresa Sanchez-Gordon 10:00 am | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-01-29 00:00:00 | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 (Trial; Vacated) - (Trial; Vacated) - |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 (Trial; Vacated) - |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-01-27 00:00:00 | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Trial Teresa Sanchez-Gordon 10:00 am | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 (Trial; Vacated) - (Trial; Vacated) - |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 (Trial; Vacated) - |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Teresa Sanchez-Gordon 9:00 am | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Final Status Conference - Held Final Status Conference - Held |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2014-01-10 00:00:00 | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Final Status Conference - Held |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF LANCE S. GAMS RE ATTEMPTS TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES AND DEPARTMENT 74 TRIAL GUIDELINES | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS TRIAL BRIEF | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF LANCE S. GAMS IN COMPLIANCE WITH LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT LOCAL RULES 3.57(A)(2) AND ETC | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine NO. 1 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion in Limine TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY AND ETC | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine NO. 2 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion in Limine TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY ANC EVIDENCE REGARDING QUESTIONS ABOUT ALLEGED RACE DISCRIMINATION OR ETC | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION IN L1MINE NO. 3 Motion in Limine FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING QUESTIONS ABOUT OR ETC | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation Filed by: Court | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Court |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Mandatory Settlement Conference Teresa Sanchez-Gordon 10:30 am | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF POLICIES AND PROCEDURES FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND STIPULATION | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2013-12-05 00:00:00 | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Charles F\. Palmer 9:30 am | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Charles F\. Palmer 8:30 am | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
May 22, 2013 | hearing | Calendaring:Mandatory Settlement Conference Teresa Sanchez-Gordon | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Status Conference Teresa Sanchez-Gordon 8:30 am | |
May 22, 2013 | hearing | Calendaring:Trial Teresa Sanchez-Gordon | |
May 22, 2013 | hearing | Calendaring:Final Status Conference Teresa Sanchez-Gordon | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Status Conference - Held Status Conference - Held |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2013-05-22 00:00:00 | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Status Conference - Held |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Mandatory Settlement Conference Owen Lee Kwong 8:45 am | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2013-05-20 00:00:00 | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER | |
March 22, 2013 | hearing | Calendaring:Status Conference Teresa Sanchez-Gordon | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order Re: Reassignment of Case Teresa Sanchez-Gordon 8:30 am | |
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Unknown Event Type |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Order Charles F\. Palmer 11:00 am | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2013-02-27 00:00:00 | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
February 25, 2013 | hearing | Calendaring:Mandatory Settlement Conference Owen Lee Kwong | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2013-02-19 00:00:00 | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Post Mediation Status Charles F\. Palmer 8:30 am | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Closed-ADR ADR Neutral | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Not held-Rmvd ADR-Other) - (Closed-ADR; Not held-Rmvd ADR-Other) - |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Not held-Rmvd ADR-Other) - |
|
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDAN Motion for Summary Judgment, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ruling on Submitted Matter Charles F\. Palmer 8:30 am | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Denied) - Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Denied) - |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-06-13 00:00:00 | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Denied) - |
|
June 12, 2012 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Post Mediation Status Charles F\. Palmer | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Taken under Submission Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-06-12 00:00:00 | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Charles F\. Palmer 8:30 am | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion for Summary Judgment; AND DECLARATION OF ADOLFO ERNESTO CRESPO | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITIO TO DEFENDANTS Motion for Summary Judgment | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-05-29 00:00:00 | |
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Michael P\. Linfield 9:00 am | |
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Michael P\. Linfield 9:00 am | |
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-05-17 00:00:00 | |
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Michael P\. Linfield 8:30 am | |
February 27, 2012 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Summary Judgment Charles F\. Palmer | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-02-27 00:00:00 | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS CCP 17O6 PREEMPTORY CHALLENGE | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE AND DEPARTMENT FOR DEFENDANTS Motion for Summary Judgment, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant); Adolfo Ernesto Crespo (Defendant) |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-02-16 00:00:00 | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Affidavit of Prejudice Michael P\. Linfield 8:30 am | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6) | |
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6) | |
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ADOLFO ERNESTO CRESPO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS Motion for Summary Judgment ETC | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ALFRED MCKNIGHT | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ALFRED MCKNIGHT'S SEPARATE STATEMENI OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion for Summary Judgment ETC | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DIANA TAING AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion for Summary Judgment ETC | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ALFRED MCKNIGHTS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS Motion for Summary Judgment ETC | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Zaven V\. Sinanian 9:00 am | |
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-02-06 00:00:00 | |
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Special Status End:Sent-Mediation-$500,001-750,000 | |
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-01-26 00:00:00 | |
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Zaven V\. Sinanian 9:00 am | |
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order Re: Reassignment of Case Michael P\. Linfield | |
January 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
January 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Unknown Event Type |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND DECLARATIONS OF ADOLFO ERNESTO CRESPO AND LANCE S. GAMS | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CITY OF SANTA MONICAS AND ADOLFO ERNESTO CRESPOS Motion for Summary Judgment | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice OF DEFENDANTS CITY OF SANTA MONICA AND ADOLFO ERNESTO CREPSO | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICAS EXPARTE APPLICATION, AND NOTICE OF NEW DATES FOR TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND Motion for Summary Judgment/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-10-11 00:00:00 | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA Ex Parte Application AND MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO SPECIALLY SET Motion for Summary JudgmentISUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; DECLARATIONS 01 LANCE S. GAMS AND JUDY JENSON IN SUPPORT T | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Exparte proceeding Zaven V\. Sinanian 8:30 am | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Mediator Filed by Mediator |
|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Mediator | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Mediator |
|
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE | |
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff); Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff); Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE | |
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff); Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Special Status Start:Sent-Mediation-$500,001-750,000 | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by: ADR Clerk CADR | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Hearing on Demurrer Zaven V\. Sinanian 8:35 am | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Off Calendar) - Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Off Calendar) - |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-04-07 00:00:00 | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Off Calendar) - |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-03-30 00:00:00 | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYCIVIL (WITHOUT COURT ORDER) | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Zaven V\. Sinanian 8:32 am | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYCIVIL (WITHOUT COURT ORDER) | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATON OF GOVT CODE 1.2940(A) AND (1) (RACE DISCRIMINATION); 2. VIOLATON OF GOVT CODE 12940(A) AND (I) (Disability Discrimination); 3. VIOLATION OF GOVT CODE 12940(N) (FAILURE TO ENGAGE IN THE INTERACTIVE PROCESS); ETC | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent | |
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | 1. NOTICE OF DemurrerAND Demurrer TO THIRD, FOURTFFIFTH AND SIXTH CAUSES OF ACTIOIFIN PLAINTIFF ALFRED MCKNIGHTS COMPLAI NT; 2. Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | 1. NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion to Strike PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ALFRED MCKNIGHT 2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed by Santa Monica, City of (Defendant) |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Zaven V\. Sinanian 8:30 am | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-02-16 00:00:00 | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Discharged) - Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Discharged) - |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Discharged) - |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per | |
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof-Service/Summons | |
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
December 30, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Zaven V\. Sinanian | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk | |
December 30, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Zaven V\. Sinanian | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Other Employment Complaint | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. RACE DISCRIMINATION; ETC. | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Alfred McKnight (Plaintiff) |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. RACE DISCRIMINATION; ETC. | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A |