Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KI SUN KIM VS JOO OK JEONG ET AL
On November 15, 2010 a contract/warranty breach - seller plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Mary Ann Murphy presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 15, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Matthew St. George;Category
Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 2 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 3,476.49; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ - Return | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Writ issued Filed by: Attorney for Creditor | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Creditor |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM IN SUPPORT OF ADDITIONAL INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT [CCP 685.050] | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Appl for Writ of Possession (C&D) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM IN SUPPORT OF ADDITIONAL INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT [CCP 685.050] | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Writ issued Filed by: Attorney for Creditor | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Creditor |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng Matthew St\. George 8:30 am | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2013-05-02 00:00:00 | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2013-05-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2013-05-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
March 19, 2013 | hearing | Calendaring:Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng Matthew St\. George | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Document:Order to Appear for Examination Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Creditor | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM IN SUPPORT OF ADDITIONAL INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Writ issued Filed by: Clerk | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Clerk |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Creditor |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor Filed by Creditor |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl. 428 Days | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM RE: PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AND ATTORNEYS FEES (CRC 3.1800) | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF 1(1 SUN KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST JOO OK JEONG, JENNY & JAY, INC., JAMES S. LEE (CRC 3.1800) | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum - Other Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | IRVI EMCRANI)TJRV1 ()F POINTS AND IALJTHOR1TIES IN SIJPPOR1 OF I)EFAULT IUDGR4IENT A(AINST JO() 0K .JEONG, JENNY & PAY, INC., JAMES S. LEI: | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE IDENTIFYING THE PARTIES AND NATURE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM (CRC 3.1800) | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Hst Data1: Hst Data2: $135,504.00 | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM RE: PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AND ATTORNEYS FEES (CRC 3.1800) | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE IDENTIFYING THE PARTIES AND NATURE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM (CRC 3.1800) | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF 1(1 SUN KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST JOO OK JEONG, JENNY & JAY, INC., JAMES S. LEE (CRC 3.1800) | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum - Other Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | IRVI EMCRANI)TJRV1 ()F POINTS AND IALJTHOR1TIES IN SIJPPOR1 OF I)EFAULT IUDGR4IENT A(AINST JO() 0K .JEONG, JENNY & PAY, INC., JAMES S. LEI: | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-01-05 00:00:00 | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) - (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) - |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2012-01-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Mary Ann Murphy 8:31 am | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) - |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2012-01-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
October 11, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Order to Show Cause Mary Ann Murphy | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-10-06 00:00:00 | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Mary Ann Murphy 8:31 am | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-10-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-10-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Supplement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF Summons ON DEFENDANT'S JOO OK JEONG AND JAMES S. LEE | |
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Mary Ann Murphy 8:31 am | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-08-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-08-25 00:00:00 | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-08-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Publication Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF Summons ON DEFENDANTS JOO OK JEONG AND JAMES S. LEE | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
July 11, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Order to Show Cause Mary Ann Murphy | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Mary Ann Murphy 8:31 am | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-07-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-07-08 00:00:00 | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-07-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PUBLICATION | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PUBLICATION | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION ON DEFENDANT JAMES S. LEE | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Clerk | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication Filed by Clerk |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PUBLICATION | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Mary Ann Murphy 8:31 am | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-05-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-19 00:00:00 | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY IUBLICAT1ON ON DEFENDANT 300 OK JEONG | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 19, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Mary Ann Murphy | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-05-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION ON DEFENDANT JAMES S. LEE | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICEOF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION ON DEFENDANT JOO OK JEONG | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 21, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Order to Show Cause Mary Ann Murphy | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Mary Ann Murphy 8:30 am | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-03-16 00:00:00 | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-03-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-03-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NBTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICA11ON | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NORICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND /ORDER FOR PUBLICATION | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AND DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN T. KIM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; VERIFICATION OF KI SUN KIM | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
February 03, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:Order to Show Cause Mary Ann Murphy | |
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) - Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) - |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Mary Ann Murphy 8:30 am | |
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-02-02 00:00:00 | |
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-02-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-02-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 25 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) - |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons & COMPLAINT | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
November 18, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Mary Ann Murphy | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASK MANACKIVIEN1 CONFERENCE | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | ORI)ER TO) SLIOW CAUSE HEARIN(; | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 18, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Mary Ann Murphy | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | ORI)ER TO) SLIOW CAUSE HEARIN(; | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BRFACH OF CONTRACT; (2) COMMON CO1NTS: Account Stated; ETC. | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Breach Contrct/Warnty (Sellr Pltf) | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ki Sun Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BRFACH OF CONTRACT; (2) COMMON CO1NTS: Account Stated; ETC. |