Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Forrar, Michele filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Macbeth, Allison G., against Gomez, Aldo, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Anne-Christine Massullo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnne-Christine Massullo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2002 |
CategoryCriminal Appeal |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE BRIEF.(O/B DUE 2/15/02.)
Date: February 13, 2002APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED:(R/B DUE 4/08/02.)
Date: March 18, 2002APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE O/B & SUPP. DECL.
Date: January 31, 2002APPLICATION & SUPPORTING DECLARATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE BRIEF FILED.
Date: February 15, 2002NTC. OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.(O/B DUE 2/4/02.)
Date: January 09, 2002RESPONDENT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED.(REPLY DUE 4/23/02.)
Date: April 08, 2002Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2002 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FILED. | |
October 01, 2002 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FILED | |
July 22, 2002 | Docket Event | ORDER REVERSING & REMANDING DENIAL OF MOTION TO SUPPRESS FILED.(REMITTITUR DUE 8/06/02.) | |
June 14, 2002 | Hearing |
ADDED TO APPELLATE - WRIT CALENDAR FOR Appellate Calendar
Judge: APPELLATE (ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO PRESIDING) |
|
May 15, 2002 | Docket Event | ADDED TO APPELLATE - WRIT CALENDAR FOR APPELLATE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR JUN-14-2002 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 509 | |
May 15, 2002 | Docket Event | NTC. OF HEARING FILED | |
April 08, 2002 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED.(REPLY DUE 4/23/02.) | |
March 18, 2002 | Docket Event | APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED:(R/B DUE 4/08/02.) | |
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE BRIEF FILED(O/B DUE 3/18/02.) | |
February 15, 2002 | Docket Event | APPLICATION & SUPPORTING DECLARATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE BRIEF FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.