Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Berg, Thomas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against 1-20, Does, Drug Abuse Alternatives Center, Okon, Lorato Mamiki, represented by Shryock, Edwin Forrest, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Daum, Elliot Lee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2020 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Microsoft_Word_Answer
Date: June 22, 202260115NOTIC006d33
Date: July 08, 202260115Propo01b6b1
Date: July 08, 202260115MEMOR037068
Date: July 08, 202260115Proof024204
Date: July 08, 202260115DECLA0665cb
Date: July 08, 202260115DECLA04a9ed
Date: July 08, 202260115DECLA050a1a
Date: July 08, 202261189Proof01565c
Date: August 01, 202261189Amend006682
Date: August 01, 202264093NOTIC001bd2
Date: September 28, 202264900Notic009b18
Date: October 14, 202264841Answe006bab
Date: October 13, 202269754DEFEN00d36c
Date: January 24, 202377484CaseM00e628
Date: June 15, 202359299Notic008182
Date: June 21, 2022Microsoft_Word_Posting_Jury_Fees
Date: June 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5 day Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 77484CaseM00e628 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Only |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 69754DEFEN00d36c | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 64900Notic009b18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.