Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Marvin Trammell, Trammell, Marvin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kranz, Paul L., Paul L. Kranz, against Flores, Francisco Javier, Francisco Javier Flores, Hunter Mail Advertising Co, Kp Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Karin S. Schwartz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKarin S. Schwartz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Order re: Compliance Hearing re OSC re Dismissal Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 08, 2023Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 03, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 01, 2023Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 02, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 01, 2023Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 02, 2022Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re OSC re Dismissal)
Date: March 08, 2023Declaration Re Order To Show Cause Filed by: Marvin Trammell (Plaintiff)
Date: March 07, 2023Minute Order (Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re OSC re D...)
Date: April 20, 2023Declaration Re Order to Show Cause Filed by: Marvin Trammell (Plaintiff)
Date: April 17, 2023Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)
Date: January 05, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: August 03, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 04, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: May 04, 2022Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 05, 2022Tentative Ruling Published for 02/01/2023 3:00 PM Case Management Conference}
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Marvin Trammell (Plaintiff)
Date: December 28, 2021Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 20 - Hon. Karin Schwartz
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Tentative Ruling Published for 03/08/2023 3:00 PM Compliance Hearing re OSC re Dismissal}
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 26, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 01/05/2022 02:30 PM D- 521
Date: August 26, 2021Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marvin Trammell
Date: August 23, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 01/05/2022 02:30 PM D- 521
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marvin Trammell
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re Payment of Court-Ordered Sanctions | ||
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re OSC re S...) Minute Order |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re OSC re Sanctions or Dismissal scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 07/26/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order re: Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re OSC re Sanctions or Dismissal Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re Payment of Court-Ordered Sanctions scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20 Event |
|
July 26, 2023 | Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re OSC re Sanctions or Dismissal | ||
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 07/26/2023 3:00 PM Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re OSC re Sanctions or Dismissal} Tentative Ruling |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 07/26/2023 3:00 PM Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing re OSC re Sanctions or Dismissal} Tentative Ruling |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by: Hunter Mail Advertising CO (Defendant) Document |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: KP LLC (Defendant); Francisco Javier Flores (Defendant) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.