Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Spice Delight, Inc, Eason, Deborah Antionette, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mgdesyan Law Firm, against Blm Victorville, Dollar Tree Stores Inc, Spice Delight Inc, represented by Thompson & Colegate, Thompson & Colgate, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions791 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional)
Date: January 17, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Motion Filed
Date: March 08, 2019At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 28, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 23, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: October 25, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: April 24, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: January 10, 2018Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 19, 2017Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 30, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 21, 2019Declaration re:
Date: January 19, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: October 09, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 13, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 24, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: October 09, 2023Reply Filed
Date: April 30, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: October 09, 2023Motion re:
Date: December 21, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 20, 2019Reply Filed
Date: January 19, 2021Reply Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 14, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: October 31, 2023Notice Imaged
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 13, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: August 09, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: June 27, 2017Answer Filed
Date: April 10, 2017Answer Filed
Date: June 27, 2017Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: June 27, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 07, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: September 05, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 28, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: December 08, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 08, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 13, 2017Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: June 07, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 08, 2016Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: April 10, 2017Summons Issued on
Date: June 07, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: April 13, 2017At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: June 01, 2017Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 14, 2017Summons Issued on
Date: June 14, 2017Answer Filed
Date: July 12, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 27, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 18, 2017Summons Issued on
Date: June 27, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 27, 2017Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 18, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 15, 2019Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: January 05, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 17, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: May 17, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 05, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 09, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 29, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 16, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 25, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 15, 2018Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: May 01, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: December 08, 2016Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 06, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 08, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 05, 2018Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: May 29, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: April 24, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: May 05, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Notice
Date: August 09, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 05, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 09, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: May 05, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 07, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 14, 2018Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Answer Filed
Date: June 15, 2018Amended Document Filed re:
Date: March 11, 2019Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: December 21, 2020Trial Setting Order filed
Date: January 10, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 12, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 07, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: May 05, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
January 18, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional) | |
January 16, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Order filed MSC and Trial Orders for Department S25 |
|
January 08, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
November 27, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
November 22, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 2 includes documents filed between 12/21/20 - 11/16/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.