Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rechsteiner, Eric J., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Raxter, Jeremiah D, against Bown, David H., Freeland, Mike E., represented by Hartsuyker Stratman & Williams-Abrego, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S. McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2013 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time622 days |
Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 31, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 20, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 20, 2014Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 04, 2014Order Filed Re:
Date: August 12, 2013Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 12, 2013Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 20, 2014Declaration re:
Date: August 09, 2013Notice Imaged
Date: April 09, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 20, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 20, 2014Declaration Filed
Date: August 09, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 22, 2013Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 07, 2013Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: July 26, 2013Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 31, 2013Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 31, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 30, 2013Summons Issued on
Date: January 22, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2014 | |||
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF ERIC J. RECHSTEINER |
|
October 16, 2014 | |||
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
September 15, 2014 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ;10911 COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THE COURT NOTES THAT A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE HAS BEEN FILED AND SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN OSC RE: DISMISSAL ON 10/16/14. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 10/16/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30 NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
September 11, 2014 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ERIC J. RECHSTEINER. |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT COURT REPORTER LAWANA VASQUEZ;12582 COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JEREMIAH RAXTER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY DONALD W. MATEJKA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THIS MATTER IS TO PROCEED WITH JURY TRIAL ON 09/15/14 AT 10 A.M. - HEARINGS: HEARING DATE OF 09/15/14 CONFIRMED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.