Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Addiego, Karen, filed a(n) Civil case represented by West, Alan Douglas, against Does 1 To 20 Inclusive, Hymes, David, represented by St.Clair, Ronald Powelson, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions147 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time349 days |
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 23, 2013DECLARATION OF ALAN D. WEST RE: ATTORNEY'S FEE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ADDIEGO, KAREN
Date: December 11, 2013DECLARATION RE: ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ADDIEGO, KAREN
Date: December 11, 2013PROMISSORY NOTE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ADDIEGO, KAREN
Date: December 11, 2013DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE
Date: December 11, 2013CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ADDIEGO, KAREN
Date: January 13, 2014ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND DEFAULT OF JUL-23-2013 SET ASIDE
Date: February 24, 2014DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 06, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ADDIEGO, KAREN
Date: January 13, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HYMES, DAVID
Date: March 04, 2014MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ADDIEGO, KAREN
Date: January 13, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2014 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-23-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 20, 2014 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order For Entry Of Judgment By Default
Judge: HARRY DORFMAN |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF MAR-20-2014 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT OFF CALENDAR. (514) | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HYMES, DAVID | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED VACATING AND SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT FILED BY DEFENDANT HYMES, DAVID | |
February 24, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside And Vacaating Default Set for hearing on Monday, February 24, 2014, Line 9, DEFENDANT DAVID HYMES' Motion To Set Aside And Vacating Default Granted. No opposit...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
February 24, 2014 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside And Vacaating Default
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND DEFAULT OF JUL-23-2013 SET ASIDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.