Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alva Joanne, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Khorshidi Omid Esq., against Allstate Indemnity Company, represented by Badawi Suzanne Y, Klee Peter Hans, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Draper Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time412 days |
Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Allstate Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Allstate Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joanne Alva (Plaintiff); As to: Joanne Alva (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Allstate Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) BAD FAITH -FAILURE TO PROPERLY INVESTIGATE CLAIM ;ETC
Date: January 25, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 25, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 14, 2018DECLARATION -
Date: February 20, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 11, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT & NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Date: April 25, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 01, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 02, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: June 04, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: May 24, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 15, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: July 03, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 31, 2018PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER
Date: August 07, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: August 14, 2018REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ALLSTATE'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2018RULING
Date: August 22, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: August 22, 2018Minute Order -
Date: August 22, 2018Notice of Ruling -
Date: October 09, 2018Answer - to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: October 16, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 12, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: March 14, 2019Declaration
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert S. Draper 9:30 am | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2019-05-29 00:00:00 | |
May 29, 2019 | Hearing |
in Department 78 Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Robert S. Draper 8:30 am | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2019-05-14 00:00:00 | |
May 14, 2019 | Hearing |
in Department 78 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
in Department 78 Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.