Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dewitt Kurt Von Kraemer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Asham Mena Nashat, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Mta, represented by Levy Nazila Yamin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William A. MacLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. MacLaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial732 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1035 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1035 days |
Special Verdict; Filed by: Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00RECORD OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN AND WITHDRAWN; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 27, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 01, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: September 08, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 16, 2016Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 11, 2019DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL
Date: March 09, 2017ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: April 10, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEV?D AS COUNSEL-CIVIL
Date: March 09, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: April 11, 2017Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel deposition of plaintiff Kurt Von Kraemer Dewitt
Date: October 22, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel deposition of Kurt Von Kraemer De...)
Date: November 19, 2018Other - - Notice Of Continuance Of Hearing Regarding Motion
Date: November 20, 2018Order - Order By the Court granting motion to compel deposition and imposing sanctions
Date: December 03, 2018Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1-7
Date: February 21, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: March 11, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: March 11, 2019Opposition - ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: March 11, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: March 15, 2019Motion re: - MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR AS A REBUTTAL WITNESS
Date: March 29, 2019ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2016Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Mena Nashat Asham (Defendant); Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Notice Filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Order Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1) Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (3-5) court days;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Answer to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Robert Jay Mandell, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge MacLaughlin, Dept. 89, Central, OTR forthwith; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Judgment On Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 04, 2019Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6); Filed by:
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: David Joseph Koppelman (Attorney)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine no. 2; Filed by: Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel deposition of Kurt Von Kraemer De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (no. 2) Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Final Status Conf...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Answer to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 8 Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Order (By the Court granting motion to compel deposition and imposing sanctions) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel deposition of Kurt Von Kraemer De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney Filed by Robert Jay Mandell, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge MacLaughlin, Dept. 89, Central, OTR forthwith) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney Filed by David Joseph Koppelman (Attorney)
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Judgment On Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Cheri Bullock Filed by Mena Nashat Asham (Defendant); Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR AS A REBUTTAL WITNESS Filed by Kurt Von Kraemer DeWitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel (deposition of plaintiff Kurt Von Kraemer Dewitt)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel deposition of Kurt Von Kraemer De...))
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration of Nazila Y. Levy Regarding Meet and Confer
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Notice (Of Ruling Re Final Status Conference)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice Of Continuance Of Hearing Regarding Motion
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Order (By the Court granting motion to compel deposition and imposing sanctions)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel deposition of Kurt Von Kraemer De...))
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial Dates;)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1-7)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Order (By the Court granting ex parte continuance of FSC and trial dates)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Final Status Conf...))
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Opposition (By Plaintiff Re: ex parte application of deft. to cont. FSC and trial dates)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice (PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATION FOR FORMER DEPOSITION AND FORMER TESTIMONY)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00TO APPROXIMATE TIME REQUIRED TO FINALIZE PLAINITFF'S TESTIMONY - REMAINING TOPICS
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (no. 2)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (GAIL R. DAVIDSON, CSR# 12823)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Answer to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 8
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge MacLaughlin, Dept. 89, Central, OTR forthwith)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (3-5) court days;))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR AS A REBUTTAL WITNESS
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Cheri Bullock
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: April 05, 2019Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00REQUEST BY JUDGE TO APPROXIMATE TIME REQUIRED TO FINALIZE PLAINTIFF'S TESTIMONY - REMAINING TOPICS
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00BY PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR AS A REBUTTAL WITNESS
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Judgment On Special Verdict
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.