Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vivar Sonia, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Karakalos Aris Edmund, Strauss Michael Anthony, Palay Law Firm Apc, against Omega Resource Solutions Llc, Tallgrass Talent Group Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maren Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaren Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2014 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1383 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time1383 days |
Motion to Compel - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: February 27, 2017Order - -ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: February 15, 2018Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: August 01, 2018Notice
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2014-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-12-02 00:00:00
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-12-22 00:00:00
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-03-11 00:00:00
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-05-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Request
Date: 2015-09-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-26 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-20 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-04 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Amend Uncashed Checks Provision of Class Settlement and Final Judgment
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Amended Joint Stipulation to Amend Uncashed Checks Provision of Class Settlement and Final Judgment
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Receiver's Final Accounting and Report))
Date: June 25, 2019Disbursement Declaration of Melinda Yang on Behalf if Claims Administrator
Date: July 12, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Filing of Administrator's Report))
Date: July 19, 2019Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Final Report & Distribution of...))
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.