Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by London & London, against Matthew Barks, represented by 28 Seagrave St, in the jurisdiction of Windham County, CT, . Windham County, CT Superior Courts with John M. Newson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M. Newson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2017 |
CategoryS15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWindham County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: August 15, 2017RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 19, 2017EXECUTION ISSUED
Date: August 29, 2018APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION-DEBTOR IS A NATURAL PERSON (JD-CV-24)
Date: August 28, 2018EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES
Date: June 07, 2022SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2017APPEARANCE
Date: July 11, 2022APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: August 15, 2017EXECUTION RETURNED
Date: June 07, 2022MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2017ORDER RESULT: Order 11/7/2017 HON JOHN NEWSON
Date: November 07, 2017MOTION FOR EXEMPTION FROM EXECUTION (JD-CV-3a/JD-CV-24A/JD-CV-5b)
Date: July 06, 2022EXECUTION RETURNED CORRECTED
Date: June 14, 2022ORDER HEARING AND NOTICE
Date: July 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/3/2022 PATRICK KENNEDY, MAG Last Updated: Entry Number - 08/04/2022 | |
August 03, 2022 | Remote Hearing | ||
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT FOR MODIFICATION OF EXECUTION (JD-CV-3a/JD-CV-24A/JD-CV-5b) - SMALL CLAIMS | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER HEARING AND NOTICE | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXEMPTION FROM EXECUTION (JD-CV-3a/JD-CV-24A/JD-CV-5b) | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURNED CORRECTED | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | EXECUTION RETURNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.