Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2021-Nmr1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bendett & Mchugh Pc, Brock And Scott Pllc, against Brenda L Bouchard, Connecticut Housing Finance Authority, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Fcv Tool Supply Llc, John W. Stevens Dds Fka John W. Stevens Dds, (total of 9) See All represented by Conn Housing Finance Authority, John Andrew Kissel, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 8/2/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 25, 2023MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2024NOTICE Notice of Filing Return of Appraisal
Date: December 04, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: October 23, 2023COMMITTEE DEED
Date: January 02, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 8/2/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: August 02, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 10/17/2023 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY
Date: October 17, 2023APPRAISAL
Date: September 20, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: September 20, 2023MOTION FOR JUDGMENT-STRICT FORECLOSURE RESULT: Order 10/17/2023 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/21/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 21, 2023COMMITTEE REPORT
Date: December 20, 2023OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: September 20, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT As to Brenda L. Bouchard
Date: September 20, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 22, 2023COMMITTEE DEED
Date: March 14, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: June 30, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/14/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY
Date: March 14, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/2/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: August 02, 2023APPRAISAL
Date: December 04, 2023RETURN OF SALE -NO PROCEEDS JD-CV-97
Date: February 08, 2024MOTION FOR ORDER OF PAYMENTS RESULT: Granted 1/2/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY
Date: December 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2023ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/2/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY
Date: January 02, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/17/2023 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY Watermark
Date: October 17, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT As to Robert W. Miller, Jr.
Date: September 20, 2023SUMMONS
Date: March 09, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 10, 2023OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: December 04, 2023DISCLOSURE OF NO DEFENSE EVERSOURCE ENERGY
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: December 20, 2023FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: September 20, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 9/21/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 12, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #003 | ||
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/14/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE COMMITTEE-MOTION FOR ADVICE-JD-CV-100 RESULT: Granted 3/14/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SALE -NO PROCEEDS JD-CV-97 | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5 bill of cost 15 Cherry Valley Rd 23-17309 | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/2/2024 HON MOIRA BUCKLEY | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.