Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carlos Casillas, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Suisman Shapiro Wool Brennan Gray & Gree, against Carolyn Hart, James M Gay, Stonehouse, Llc, represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca Llp, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Shari A. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShari A. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
|
ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/3/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: February 03, 2020OBJECTION Objection to Plaintiff's Scheduling Order Dated 5/8/20 (#128.00)
Date: May 11, 2020MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: June 04, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 2/3/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: January 22, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER Defendants Proposed Scheduling Order
Date: May 11, 2020MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike
Date: April 29, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/11/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: February 11, 2020ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE Stonehouse, LLC's Answer and Special Defenses
Date: March 19, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 08, 2020ORDER RESULT: Rejected 5/26/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: May 26, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/13/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: May 13, 2020ORDER RESULT: Sustained 5/26/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: May 26, 2020ANSWER AND/OR OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PB 13-23(a) BY - D-02 JAMES M GAY
Date: April 21, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/24/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: June 26, 2020REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130
Date: October 27, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/24/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: September 24, 2020MEMORANDUM of law in support of Defendants' Motion to Strike No.135.00
Date: June 10, 2020REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130
Date: November 18, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/5/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: May 05, 2020MOTION TO STRIKE RESULT: Granted 7/9/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: April 29, 2020OBJECTION TO MOTION to strike No. 126.00 RESULT: Off 6/16/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: June 10, 2020ORDER RESULT: Off 6/16/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: June 16, 2020STIPULATION RE: Motion to Strike
Date: June 26, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/9/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: July 09, 2020REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130
Date: September 17, 2020ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE James M. Gay's Answer and Special Defenses
Date: March 19, 2020ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE Carolyn Hart's Answer and Special Defenses
Date: March 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSION PB 13-22 As to Stonehouse, LLC | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSION PB 13-22 As to Carolyn Hart | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSION PB 13-22 As to dfd James M. Gay | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130 | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130 | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/24/2020 BY THE COURT | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130 | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/9/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Re: Stonehouse, LLC's Supplemental Discovery Compliance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.