Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Katherinee C Mantilla, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ventura Law, against Drew R Mencio, Tri-Star Service, Inc., represented by Meehan Di Palma Roberts & Turret Law Off, Meehan Roberts Turret & Rosenbaum Law Of, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Matthew D. Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2018 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD as to defendant DREW MENCIO
Date: November 21, 2019TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Def. TMR
Date: November 22, 2019OBJECTION to Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 26, 2018CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: November 26, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: June 07, 2018OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT
Date: September 25, 2019CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: November 26, 2019DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Expert Dr. Levin
Date: January 15, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 04, 2018ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: November 25, 2019DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: August 02, 2018MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Order 11/20/2019 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: November 20, 2019ORDER re #124 RESULT: Denied 12/11/2019 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 11, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD as to defendant TRI-STAR SERVICES INC.
Date: November 21, 2019APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 08, 2018MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: September 19, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 RESULT: Denied 1/3/2019 HON BARBARA BRAZZEL-MASSARO
Date: August 07, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2018ORDER RESULT: Denied 1/3/2019 HON BARBARA BRAZZEL-MASSARO
Date: January 03, 2019NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE as to both def. D. Mencio & Tri-Star Service
Date: September 25, 2018SUMMONS
Date: June 04, 2018ORDER re #123 RESULT: Denied 12/11/2019 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 11, 2019ORDER RESULT: Off 12/23/2019 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER RESULT: Off 12/3/2019 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: December 03, 2019ORDER RESULT: Order 11/20/2019 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: November 20, 2019ORDER RESULT: Order 8/6/2018 HON BARBARA BRAZZEL-MASSARO
Date: August 06, 2018MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: March 01, 2023TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Plaintiff Amended Trial Management Report
Date: February 13, 2020MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Request for continuance of trial
Date: February 13, 2020CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: December 18, 2019TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: November 21, 2019TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Def. Amended Trial Mangement Report
Date: February 13, 2020WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: April 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/1/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: March 01, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: November 26, 2019MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: September 28, 2018MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Mot. to Dismiss
Date: August 09, 2018NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: August 02, 2018ORDER RESULT: Off 9/4/2018 HON BARBARA BRAZZEL-MASSARO
Date: September 04, 2018OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT RESULT: Off 4/23/2021 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: April 06, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 4/23/2021 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: April 23, 2021ORDER RESULT: Sustained 8/1/2018 HON MARK TAYLOR
Date: August 01, 2018CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: June 27, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/6/2021 BY THE COURT
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE of Service - Interrogatories & Production to defendant Drew R. Mencio
Date: June 21, 2018MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: June 03, 2020MOTION TO TRANSFER Motion to Transfer Venue
Date: July 12, 2018ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/1/2018 HON MARK TAYLOR
Date: August 01, 2018ORDER RESULT: Off 7/9/2018 HON BARBARA BRAZZEL-MASSARO
Date: July 09, 2018ORDER RESULT: Off 9/28/2018 HON BARBARA BRAZZEL-MASSARO
Date: September 28, 2018OBJECTION TO MOTION to Transfer Venue
Date: July 30, 2018NOTICE Notice of Service of Std. D&P upon the pltf.
Date: June 19, 2018TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: March 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON MOTION
Date: January 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
March 29, 2023 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 22, 2023 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT | |
March 07, 2023 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/1/2023 BY THE COURT | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) Def. MOC to Pltf. | |
September 08, 2022 | Remote Status Conference | ||
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.