Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jose Cartagena Rivera, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rome Clifford Katz & Koerner Llp, against Abeldalrazaq Alkukhun Md, Gwendeline Demers, P.A., Mounika Gunduru Md, Paul A. Cedeno Md, Yale New Haven Hospital, Inc., A K A Yale New Haven Medical Center D B A Shoreline Medical Center-Guilford A K A Yale New Haven Health A K A Yale New Haven Health System, (total of 6) See All represented by Wiggin & Dana Llp, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts NEW HAVEN JD with Barbara Bailey Jongbloed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2022 |
CategoryT28 - Torts - Malpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseNEW HAVEN JD |
CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: December 04, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: December 04, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Supplemental
Date: November 22, 2023MOTION TO STRIKE FROM JURY DOCKET On behalf of the Defendants
Date: January 08, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: November 23, 2022NOTICE Notice of Service A. Alkukhun MD, P. Cedeno, MD, M. Gunduru, MD and G. Demers, PA.
Date: January 09, 2023SUMMONS
Date: November 23, 2022NOTICE Notice of Service - Yale University, Yale New Haven Hospital, Inc
Date: January 09, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 2/22/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: February 06, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 08, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2022ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/23/2023 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: January 23, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 1/23/2023 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: January 05, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD On behalf of the Defendants
Date: April 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/20/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: April 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 3/15/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: March 15, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/22/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: February 22, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Order 3/15/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: March 15, 2023ANSWER On behalf of Defendant, Yale New Haven Hospital
Date: May 23, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/27/2023 HON BARBARA JONGBLOED
Date: March 27, 2023ANSWER On behalf of Defendant, Yale University
Date: May 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2024 | Trial | ||
October 14, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
January 22, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-12 #010 | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE FROM JURY DOCKET On behalf of the Defendants | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6 | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Supplemental | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER On behalf of Defendant, Yale New Haven Hospital | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER On behalf of Defendant, Yale University | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL IN PART Abeldalrazaq Alkukhun, M.D.,Paul A. Cedeno, M.D.,Mounika Gunduru, M.D.&Gwendeline Demers, PA, ONLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.