Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Summit Associates, Ltd., An Afghanistan Corporation, Summit Associates, Ltd., A New York Corporation, filed a(n) M50 - Misc - Declaratory Judgment case represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff Llc, against Abdul Rahman Yamrali, represented by Pat Labbadia Iii, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Robin L. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryM50 - Misc - Declaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
|
MOTION TO REARGUE/RECONSIDER RESULT: Denied 1/18/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: August 26, 2021MEMORANDUM regarding Effect of Pending Motion to Dismiss (#106.00)
Date: November 16, 2020CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 7/15/2020 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: July 15, 2020CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Order 9/23/2020 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: September 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-31
Date: February 05, 2020WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Motion for Default for Failure to Plead, D.E. 149.00
Date: September 22, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Joint Request for Status Conference
Date: September 29, 2021MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION in support of Motion to Dismiss (#106.00)
Date: February 16, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/7/2021 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: April 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/15/2020 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: July 15, 2020ORDER RESULT: Off 10/23/2020 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: October 23, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2019REPLY to Defendant's Objection to Demand for Disclosure of Defense and Motion for Default
Date: November 17, 2020MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 17, 2020ORDER RESULT: Off 7/15/2020 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: July 15, 2020DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE PB 13-19
Date: October 22, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/21/2019 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 21, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 RESULT: Denied 8/5/2021 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 06, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 11/27/2020 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: November 27, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 12/23/2019 HON JON BLUE
Date: December 06, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 Amended / Supplemental to Motion to Dismiss (#106.00)
Date: February 16, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/23/2019 HON JON BLUE
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER RESULT: Off 12/22/2020 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: December 22, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/5/2021 HON ROBIN WILSON Last Updated: Entry Number - 02/05/2021
Date: February 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 9/23/2020 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: September 23, 2020OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER RESULT: Overruled 4/7/2021 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: April 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/5/2021 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: August 05, 2021MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON MOTION
Date: August 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 1/18/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Sustained 1/18/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 1/18/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/18/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Withdrawn 1/18/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: January 18, 2022SUMMONS
Date: October 21, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: November 12, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Withdrawn 1/18/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: September 21, 2021NOTICE of Grouping of Filings by Subject Category
Date: January 13, 2022NOTICE re Case Flow Request (#106.00) & Need for a Hearing
Date: September 23, 2020MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT
Date: February 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 3/9/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE of Deposition of Plaintiff Summit Associates AFGHANISTAN
Date: December 06, 2019APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 06, 2019NOTICE of Deposition of Plaintiff Summit Associates NEW YORK
Date: December 06, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE DEFENSE RESULT: Order 11/27/2020 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: November 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT In Support of Motion to Dismiss #106 #132
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE of Deposition of REHA CELIKAY
Date: December 06, 2019CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Conversion of Pretrial Conf. to Status Conf.
Date: March 08, 2022MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT SUPPLEMENTAL RESULT: Off 3/21/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER RESULT: Off 3/9/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 09, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/8/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 08, 2022DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE
Date: March 11, 2022OBJECTION TO REQUEST Objection to Caseflow Request (#159.00)
Date: March 08, 2022REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/11/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 11, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 11, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: March 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Off 3/21/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Remote Court Trial | ||
April 13, 2022 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 28, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-15 #072 | ||
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Off 3/21/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
March 21, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-15 #070 | ||
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE to continue response date 14 days on Order to Show Cause #156.10, #158.10, #159.10 + #160.10 | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY to Orders to Show Cause (#156.10, #158.10, #159.10 and #160.10) received after hours eve of 3/9 | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 RESULT: Off 3/21/2022 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.