Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee For Lsf8 Master Participation Trust, filed a(n) case against Jane Doe I, Jane Doe Ii, John Doe I, John Doe Ii, Patrick Richardson, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2020 |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: February 28, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2020HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: February 11, 2020ORDER RESULT: Rejected 2/26/2020 BY THE CLERK
Date: February 26, 2020OBJECTION TO ENTRY NUMBER 104.0
Date: April 02, 2020OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: March 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO ENTRY NUMBER 104.0 | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO REVISE | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REVISE | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD AND POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Rejected 2/26/2020 BY THE CLERK | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD AND POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.