Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bendett & Mchugh Pc, against Brian J Ducey Aka Ducey, Brian, Cach, Llc, Charlotte Hungerford Hospital, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 6) See All represented by 1602 Nantahala Blvd, Hertzmark Crean & Lahey Llp, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with Carl J. Schuman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2016 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/13/2017 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 13, 2017MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/13/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: October 13, 2017RETURN OF SALE -NO PROCEEDS JD-CV-97
Date: June 08, 2017COMMITTEE DEED
Date: June 01, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/12/2017 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 12, 2017BILL OF COSTS RESULT: Granted 6/12/2017 BY THE CLERK
Date: May 26, 2017COMMITTEE REPORT
Date: May 02, 2017ORDER RESULT: Order 5/15/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: May 15, 2017OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: April 19, 2017NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: February 03, 2017ORDER Judgment of Foreclosure by Sale RESULT: Order 1/23/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: January 23, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: January 19, 2017FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: January 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: January 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: January 19, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: January 05, 2017APPRAISAL
Date: December 14, 2016OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: December 14, 2016MOTION FOR JUDGMENT-STRICT FORECLOSURE RESULT: Order 1/23/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: December 14, 2016DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE PB 13-19
Date: December 14, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/22/2016 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 22, 2016MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: December 14, 2016ORDER RESULT: Order 12/22/2016 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 22, 2016MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: December 14, 2016SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: December 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT FORECLOSURE BY MARKET SALE NOTICE (JD-CV-147)
Date: October 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT FEDERAL LOSS MITIGATION PROGRAMS (JD-CL-114)
Date: October 14, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2016APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 06, 2017APPEARANCE
Date: January 30, 2017APPEARANCE
Date: October 31, 2016APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 21, 2016ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: October 11, 2016SUMMONS
Date: October 11, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/13/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | REPLACE RECORD TO PLEADING STATUS (KEYPOINT 2) AND ERASE ALL HIGHER KEYPOINT DATES | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT RESULT: HON CARL SCHUMAN | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/12/2017 BY THE CLERK | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SALE -NO PROCEEDS JD-CV-97 | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS RESULT: Granted 6/12/2017 BY THE CLERK | |
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/15/2017 HON CARL SCHUMAN | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.