Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pierce Llc, against Joann Joray, Scasco Formagginoi Oil, Scott D. Joray, represented by Po Box 911, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John W. Pickard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Pickard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER Cert rejected. No occupy, not primary RESULT: Rejected 1/30/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 30, 2014MOTION FOR DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT PB 23-19
Date: July 18, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/18/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: May 18, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/12/2014 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION
Date: March 12, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/12/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 12, 2014MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT
Date: May 01, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2013FORECLOSURE MEDIATION REQUEST/CERTIFICATE JD-CV-108 RESULT: Rejected 1/30/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 13, 2014BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5
Date: May 28, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: May 15, 2014AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: May 15, 2014NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: May 28, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: March 04, 2014FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: May 15, 2014APPRAISAL
Date: May 05, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: May 15, 2014OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: May 05, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2013SUMMONS
Date: December 30, 2013APPEARANCE
Date: January 13, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: March 04, 2014AFFIDAVIT FEDERAL LOSS MITIGATION PROGRAMS (JD-CL-114)
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/18/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD | |
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT PB 23-19 | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/12/2014 BY THE CLERK | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5 | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER Judgment of Strict Foreclosure RESULT: Order 5/19/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF STRICT FORECLOSURE RESULT: HON JOHN PICKARD | |
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT | |
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.