Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pierce Llc, against Household Realty Corporation, Michael P Colangelo, Sawn L Colangelo, Timber Lake Homeowners Association, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John D. Moore presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Moore Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/5/2015 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 05, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/2/2015 HON JOHN MOORE
Date: March 02, 2015MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99
Date: February 23, 2015MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99
Date: February 05, 2015MOTION FOR POSSESSION JD-CV-101
Date: February 05, 2015COMMITTEE DEED
Date: March 04, 2015OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: January 21, 2015ORDER RESULT: Order 3/2/2015 HON JOHN MOORE
Date: March 02, 2015NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: November 03, 2014NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 03, 2014BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5
Date: November 03, 2014ORDER Judgment of Foreclosure By Sale RESULT: Order 10/27/2014 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: October 27, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: October 22, 2014FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: October 22, 2014APPRAISAL
Date: October 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: October 22, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: October 22, 2014MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 22, 2014OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: October 14, 2014MOTION FOR JUDGMENT-STRICT FORECLOSURE RESULT: Order 10/27/2014 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: October 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT FEDERAL LOSS MITIGATION PROGRAMS (JD-CL-114)
Date: December 20, 2013APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 29, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: June 27, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2013ORDER RESULT: Order 7/7/2014 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION
Date: July 07, 2014SUMMONS
Date: December 19, 2013SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: June 27, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/2/2015 HON JOHN MOORE | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/2/2015 HON JOHN MOORE | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99 | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99 | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR POSSESSION JD-CV-101 | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | OATH OF APPRAISERS | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/5/2015 BY THE CLERK | |
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.