Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2020-Rp2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Glass & Braus Llc, against Jody A. Horak, Mark Cichy, Njb Investments Aka Njb Investments, Llc, Silverwood Capital, Llc Series H, Viking Fuel Co., Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by 167 Mansfield Ave, 220 Orchard St, Martocchio & Oliveira Llc, Sodipo Law Group, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Claudia A. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT RESULT: Denied 5/20/2022 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: May 20, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: March 11, 2022AMENDED WRIT AND SUMMONS RE: MOTION TO CITE
Date: October 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/4/2023 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 04, 2023OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: January 11, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION 147.00
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/20/2022 HON MARK TAYLOR
Date: January 20, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 8/10/2022 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT-FEDERAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MORATORIUM (JD-CV-172)
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES RE: FILING AMENDED SUMMONS/AMENDED SUMMONS
Date: June 01, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Denied 1/24/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 06, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/5/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 1/24/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 24, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/5/2021 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: October 05, 2021MOTION FOR JUDGMENT-STRICT FORECLOSURE RESULT: Order 2/28/2022 HON MARK TAYLOR
Date: September 24, 2021AMENDED WRIT AND SUMMONS RE: MOTION TO CITE (2)
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/28/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: November 28, 2022AMENDMENT AMENDED REPLY TO OBJECTION - TO CORRECT CERTIFICATION #228
Date: December 08, 2023LETTER Foreclosure Deposit
Date: May 25, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT RE: MOTION TO CITE
Date: October 08, 2021PETITION FOR CERTIFICATION RESULT: Denied 10/3/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: July 12, 2023REPLY Reply to Defendant's objection to motion for partial supplemental judgment
Date: September 27, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 10/20/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 06, 2021APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL Motion for Review
Date: January 13, 2023REPLY Reply to 228.00 11/27/2023 D OBJECTION TO MOTION
Date: December 08, 2023SUGGESTED ORDER OF PRIORITIES
Date: September 24, 2021WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION
Date: May 27, 2022MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Granted 1/20/2022 HON MARK TAYLOR
Date: January 18, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 24, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to Request for Ejectment, entry #219.00
Date: October 30, 2023SUMMONS
Date: June 01, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: September 21, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: September 26, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: June 01, 2021MOTION FOR ORDER DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE SURREPLY
Date: December 11, 2023COMMITTEE DEED RESULT: Accepted 9/1/2022 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: September 01, 2022OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: April 21, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/7/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: February 07, 2022AMENDMENT RE: 233.00 CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: January 11, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Denied 1/12/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 11, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Order 11/16/2023 HON NEETA VATTI
Date: November 15, 2023PROPOSED EXECUTION OF EJECTMENT JD-CV-30 RESULT: Rejected 11/15/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 23, 2023OBJECTION Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Caseflow Request, Entry # 233.00
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT Current affidavit of debt
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 11/16/2023 HON NEETA VATTI
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/29/2022 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: December 29, 2022REPORT -- Exhibit Insurance Bill
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT Supporting Affidavit of Jody Horak
Date: November 27, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: entry #177.00
Date: October 24, 2022MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION Defendants' Objection to Motion for Supplemental Judgment
Date: September 26, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Motion to Intervene, entry #179.00
Date: October 24, 2022MOTION TO INTERVENE RESULT: Granted 12/20/2022 HON SUSAN CONNORS
Date: October 17, 2022MOTION FOR ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/29/2022 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: September 21, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 1/20/2022 HON MARK TAYLOR
Date: January 20, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/20/2022 HON SUSAN CONNORS
Date: December 20, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 12/29/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 29, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 5/20/2022 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: May 20, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 12/17/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 08, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: October 20, 2021OBJECTION TO MOTION AMENDED OBJECTION TO MOTION TO OPEN
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBITS Exhibit A to Supporting Affidavit of Jody Horak, entry #225.00
Date: November 27, 2023RETURN OF SALE - WITH PROCEEDS
Date: September 30, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 11/2/2022 HON SUSAN CONNORS
Date: November 02, 2022ORDER RESULT: Rejected 11/15/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/20/2023 HON NEETA VATTI
Date: December 20, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/13/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 13, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/17/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 17, 2021ORDER Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration En Banc
Date: May 10, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 23, 2022MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 03, 2022MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT RE: NOTICE OF FILING OF UPDATED ADJUSTED AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: May 18, 2022FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S FINAL REPORT - MEDIATION PERIOD TERMINATED
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 5/20/2022 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: May 20, 2022JUDGMENT FILE partial supj Last Updated: Additional Description - 01/06/2023
Date: January 06, 2023MOTION FOR POSSESSION JD-CV-101 RESULT: Granted 9/1/2022 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: May 27, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 2/7/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 25, 2022APPEAL TO APPELLATE COURT
Date: January 18, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: April 08, 2024ORDER RESULT: Sustained 2/9/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: February 09, 2024MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 16, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/9/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: February 09, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 2/9/2024 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: February 09, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/11/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: March 11, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Denied 2/9/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: February 06, 2024MOTION FOR ARTICULATION RESULT: Denied 3/11/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: February 06, 2024REPLY Reply to Defendants' objection to Plaintiff's motion to compel disbursement
Date: February 20, 2024ORDER RESULT: Sustained 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: April 08, 2024REPLY Reply to motion to reconsider RESULT: Sustained 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: March 22, 2024OBJECTION intervenors Objection to Defendant's motion to reconsider
Date: March 25, 2024MOTION TO REARGUE/RECONSIDER RESULT: Denied 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: March 14, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER RESULT: Overruled 3/11/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER RESULT: Off 1/30/2024 HON NEETA VATTI
Date: January 30, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 12/13/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 13, 2022APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL AC Order on Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 15, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to motion to strike
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 12/2/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 02, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION RESULT: Sustained 12/27/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: November 04, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION
Date: January 09, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/18/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: November 18, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: March 11, 2022ORDER SC ORDER DENYING PET. CERT. (PSC-230111)
Date: October 03, 2023WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION 154.00
Date: May 20, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/3/2023 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 03, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/1/2022 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: September 01, 2022ORDER RESULT: Off 1/30/2023 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 30, 2023PROPOSED WRIT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RE: PROPOSED AMENDED WRIT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: October 26, 2021REPLY Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Objection, Entry #186.00
Date: November 28, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 11/18/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: November 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/27/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 27, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION RESULT: Order 12/29/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: September 23, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Defendants' Moiton to file a surreply
Date: December 18, 2023REPLY
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER RESULT: Sustained 12/27/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 27, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to Request for Ejectment, entry #219.00
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/27/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 27, 2022PETITION FOR CERTIFICATION RESULT: Denied 10/3/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: September 27, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, entry #204.00
Date: November 27, 2023MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 23, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION to Defendants Motion for Extension of Time and Sanctions
Date: November 01, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 15, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: May 20, 2022ORDER SC ORDER DENYING PET. CERT. (PSC-230112)
Date: October 03, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER SC ORDER DENYING PET. CERT. (PSC-230172)
Date: October 03, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT RE: MOTION TO CITE (2)
Date: November 17, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 5/16/2022 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER RESULT: Sustained 11/2/2022 HON SUSAN CONNORS
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE CERTIFIED NOTICE OF JUDGMENT TO NON-APPEARING OWNER(S) OF EQUITY
Date: March 11, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 1/23/2023 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 23, 2023APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL AC Order on Pre Appeal Motion for Review
Date: March 15, 2023REPLY Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Objection, entries #167.00 and #168.00
Date: October 03, 2022APPELLATE COURT MATERIAL Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration
Date: August 02, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE RE: MOTION TO CITE
Date: October 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 1/12/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 12/27/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 27, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE RE: MOTION TO CITE (2)
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER RESULT: Overruled 12/29/2022 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: December 29, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/30/2023 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 30, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 2/28/2022 HON MARK TAYLOR
Date: February 28, 2022APPEARANCE D-04
Date: May 12, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Denied 10/5/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 24, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 10/5/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 24, 2021APPEARANCE L-02
Date: October 17, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/16/2022 HON MATTHEW BUDZIK
Date: May 16, 2022SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: November 24, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/20/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/8/2021 HON MARK TAYLOR
Date: November 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: January 20, 2022FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: September 03, 2021FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR’S PREMEDIATION REPORT
Date: July 28, 2021APPELLATE COURT DECISION APPEAL DISMISSED RESULT: BY THE COURT
Date: July 10, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 6/17/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: June 17, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/20/2022 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: June 01, 2021APPRAISAL
Date: January 11, 2022FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: January 20, 2022MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 23, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/23/2023 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT ADJUSTMENT TO AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: January 20, 2022MOTION FOR ORDER Defendants' Motion for Order RESULT: Denied 11/2/2022 HON SUSAN CONNORS
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER RESULT: Overruled 1/3/2023 HON CLAUDIA BAIO
Date: January 03, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to File Reply
Date: September 28, 2022OBJECTION Defendants' Objection to Motion to Intervene
Date: January 23, 2023LETTER Foreclosure Proceeds Last Updated: Additional Description - 10/03/2022
Date: September 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 10/5/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #040 | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Sustained 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO | |
April 08, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #031 | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Defendants' Motion for Order to Nullify Sale RESULT: Sustained 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION intervenors Objection to Defendant's motion to reconsider | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY Reply to motion to reconsider RESULT: Sustained 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Order to Nullify Foreclosure Sale | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REARGUE/RECONSIDER RESULT: Denied 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER Defendants' Motion for Order to Nullify Foreclosure Sale RESULT: Denied 4/8/2024 HON CLAUDIA BAIO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.