Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Phoenix Environmental Laboratories, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Robert Noonan & Associates, against Clarence J Beames Iv, represented by Irene E Bassock, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Susan Quinn Cobb presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryC90 - Contracts - All Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/24/2021 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: February 24, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2021SUMMONS
Date: January 28, 2021EXHIBITS Plaintiff's Exhibits
Date: May 10, 2021EXHIBITS Exhibits to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (106.0)
Date: March 25, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 14, 2022REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: February 14, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: January 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: February 14, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 RESULT: Order 5/10/2021 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: March 25, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Plaintiff's Caseflow Request on Order of Writ of Mandamus
Date: February 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 5/10/2021 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: May 10, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/24/2021 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: February 24, 2021ORDER REMOTE HEARING ORDER RESULT: Order 2/8/2021 HON DAVID SHERIDAN
Date: February 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/1/2022 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: December 01, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 1/24/2023 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/24/2023 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: January 24, 2023MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (106.0)
Date: March 25, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 26, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 12/1/2022 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: December 01, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/14/2021 HON CESAR NOBLE
Date: September 14, 2021MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: December 01, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: January 23, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 3/20/2023 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: March 17, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance with Plaintiff's Discovery Requests
Date: February 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/20/2023 HON SUSAN COBB
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | Remote Court Trial | ||
November 22, 2023 | Trial | ||
November 07, 2023 | Trial Management Conference | ||
October 05, 2023 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
May 17, 2023 | Remote Court Trial | ||
May 03, 2023 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/20/2023 HON SUSAN COBB | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 3/20/2023 HON SUSAN COBB | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance with Plaintiff's Discovery Requests | |
February 23, 2023 | Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.