Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fred K. Kaoud, filed a(n) A10 - Appeals - Taxation case represented by Jonathan J Klein, against Town Of Wilton, represented by Berchem Moses Pc, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Arnold W. Aronson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
CategoryA10 - Appeals - Taxation |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
|
MOTION FOR ORDER Motion to Compel and Motion for Non-Suit Regarding Plaintiff
Date: June 03, 2021SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2020ANSWER Answer
Date: November 12, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: September 24, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2020NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 13, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/6/2021 HON ARNOLD ARONSON
Date: August 06, 2021OBJECTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR NON-SUIT (Docket Entry No. 105.00)
Date: June 17, 2021MOTION FOR ORDER TO AMEND RETURN DATE RESULT: Granted 10/5/2020 HON RICHARD ARNOLD
Date: September 22, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/5/2020 HON RICHARD ARNOLD
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 8/6/2021 HON ARNOLD ARONSON | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/6/2021 HON ARNOLD ARONSON | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON ARNOLD ARONSON | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR NON-SUIT (Docket Entry No. 105.00) | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER Motion to Compel and Motion for Non-Suit Regarding Plaintiff | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED FROM SUPERIOR COURT JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF FAIRFIELD | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF NEW BRITAIN | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER Answer | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/5/2020 HON RICHARD ARNOLD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.