Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rosalie Irene Watson F K A Maguire, Rosalie Irene, Todd Willis A K A Willis, Todd Carl, filed a(n) A10 - Appeals - Taxation case represented by Heller Heller & Mccoy, against Town Of Waterford, represented by Suisman Shapiro Wool Brennan Gray & Gree, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Arnold W. Aronson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryA10 - Appeals - Taxation |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
|
ANSWER
Date: November 06, 2020SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: September 22, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2020NOTICE Notice of Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production
Date: February 26, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/28/2021 HON ARNOLD ARONSON
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/28/2021 HON ARNOLD ARONSON | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON ARNOLD ARONSON | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 6/28/2021 HON ARNOLD ARONSON | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE Notice of Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED FROM SUPERIOR COURT JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF NEW LONDON | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF NEW BRITAIN | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.