We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

167 Edgewood Street, Llc V. Brown-Smith, Juleen Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago

167 Edgewood Street, Llc, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by Benjamin Kristian Potok, against Jane Doe, John Doe, Juleen Brown-Smith, Romario Hales, Romeo Hales, (total of 5) See All represented by 167 Edgewood Street, 1St Floor, Fl 1St, Katherine Meny Martin, Marshall & Veale Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts .

Case Details for 167 Edgewood Street, Llc v. Jane Doe , et al.

Filing Date

June 16, 2022

Category

H00 - Housing - Summary Process

Last Refreshed

July 21, 2023

Filing Location

Fairfield County, CT

Parties for 167 Edgewood Street, Llc v. Jane Doe , et al.

Plaintiffs

167 Edgewood Street, Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Benjamin Kristian Potok

Defendants

Jane Doe

John Doe

Juleen Brown-Smith

Romario Hales

Romeo Hales

Attorneys for Defendants

167 Edgewood Street, 1St Floor

Fl 1St

Katherine Meny Martin

Marshall & Veale Llc

Case Documents for 167 Edgewood Street, Llc v. Jane Doe , et al.

APPEARANCE Appearance

Date: June 28, 2022

COMPLAINT

Date: June 16, 2022

AFFIDAVIT cares act

Date: July 05, 2022

RETURN OF SERVICE

Date: June 16, 2022

RETURN OF SERVICE

Date: August 18, 2022

MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

Date: August 23, 2022

APPEARANCE Romario Hales

Date: September 09, 2022

APPEARANCE JULEEN BROWN-SMITH

Date: September 13, 2022

NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES

Date: September 02, 2022

APPEARANCE Romeo Hales

Date: September 09, 2022

SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED

Date: September 12, 2022

APPEARANCE Appearance

Date: November 08, 2022

Case Events for 167 Edgewood Street, Llc v. Jane Doe , et al.

Type Description
Hearing
Docket Event APPEARANCE Appearance
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Off 10/24/2022 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
Docket Event MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT - HOUSING RESULT: Off 10/24/2022 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
Docket Event MOTION FOR WAIVER RESULT: Granted 10/17/2022 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Denied 10/5/2022 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
Remote Mediation
Hearing
Remote Mediation
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/19/2022 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
See all events