Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Amy Hochhauser, Rhodie Lorenz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stephanie B Nickse, against Rebecca Cerroni, represented by Gary Philip Adelman, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts BRIDGEPORT JD with Barry K. Stevens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2023 |
CategoryC00 - Contracts - Construction - All Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseBRIDGEPORT JD |
NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR PREJUDGMENT REMEDY / HEARING (JD-CV-53)
Date: February 24, 2023SUMMONS FOR HEARING
Date: February 24, 2023PROPOSED WRIT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 24, 2023APPLICATION FOR PREJUDGMENT REMEDY
Date: February 24, 2023MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF ASSETS
Date: February 24, 2023REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF BOND
Date: February 24, 2023PRE-SERVICE ORDER FOR HEARING AND NOTICE
Date: February 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 4/4/2023 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 4/4/2023 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: April 04, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Writ Summons and Complaint- Return date
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE return/notice of Writ, Summons, Complaint on counsel by agreement
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE Re docket entry 105 and 106
Date: April 18, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 5/22/2023 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: May 22, 2023WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: June 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Remote Motion to Dismiss Hearing | ||
June 20, 2023 | Short Calendar SC-03 #001 | ||
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PB 2-16 Sarah Matz's Motion for Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice PB 2-16 | |
May 31, 2023 | Remote Motion to Dismiss Hearing | ||
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY MEMORANDUM Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss and Second Affidavit | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Seeking afternoon of 6/1 or 6/2 argument on MTD currently scheduled for 5/31 am RESULT: Order 5/22/2023 HON BARRY STEVENS | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/22/2023 HON BARRY STEVENS | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-31 ref docket entry 104 | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Writ Summons and Complaint- Return date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.