Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Antongiorgi , Isabelle Maria, Schram Mcdonnell Llc, Schram , Richard, George Mundanthanam Md Pa, Mundanthanam , George, (total of 12) See All filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Taylor Donald R., Antongiorgi Isabelle Maria, against Ventas Inc, Lillibridge Healthcare Real Estate Trust Lp, Lhret Ascension Austin Partner Gp Llc, Lhret Ascension Austin Partner Ii Gp Llc, Lhret Ascension Austin Lp, (total of 10) See All represented by Stetson Roger H, Singer Matthew F, Ferguson Lloyd E., Callahan Nicholas H, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryFraud (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: May 19, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 15, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 31, 2014MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 04, 2015ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: March 04, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: March 06, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 26, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 20, 2015RESPONSE
Date: March 30, 2015AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: April 02, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: April 08, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 14, 2015ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: May 20, 2015ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: June 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.