Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cohen , Gary J, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brenner David L., against Riley , William Craig, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2010 |
CategoryGarnishment (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: March 03, 2010MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: April 08, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 27, 2010ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: April 29, 2010ORD:DENIED MOTION/APPLICATION
Date: May 06, 2010MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 18, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: May 25, 2010ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: May 28, 2010MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: June 07, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: June 16, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: June 23, 2010ORD:DENIED MOTION/APPLICATION
Date: July 02, 2010BRIEF
Date: July 09, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: July 21, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: July 23, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: August 11, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: August 12, 2010ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: August 12, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: August 26, 2010RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: September 22, 2010RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: October 15, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 16, 2012LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 22, 2013LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: December 07, 2012LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 30, 2013LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: May 22, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | EXE SERVICE OF WRIT/ORD | |
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.