Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Muhl , Carol Sue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Trahan , David Herrick, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce Waiver W/O Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: March 14, 2013ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: May 02, 2013LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: September 18, 2013AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: November 05, 2013RESPONSE TO MOTION/PLEADING
Date: January 21, 2014ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: February 06, 2014LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: November 13, 2013JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED
Date: March 12, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RECEIPT | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ORD:DECREE DIVORCE | |
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION/PLEADING | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | MTN:TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | MTN:TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.