Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nguyen , Luan D, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Audino Dominic C., Cooper Cristina Mireles, against Amland Corp, Phan , Kevin Bao, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 06, 2013MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: January 16, 2014LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 08, 2014MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER
Date: February 19, 2014BRIEF
Date: February 21, 2014OBJECTIONS
Date: March 27, 2014ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: March 11, 2014LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 08, 2014RESPONSE TO MOTION/PLEADING
Date: April 02, 2014MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: December 03, 2014MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: October 29, 2014MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: December 23, 2014MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: February 13, 2015OBJECTIONS
Date: May 01, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: April 10, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: May 01, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: March 06, 2015RESPONSE
Date: April 30, 2015JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED
Date: May 18, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: May 08, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 22, 2015RESPONSE
Date: June 05, 2015!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 04, 2015!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: June 11, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: June 25, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: June 11, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: August 14, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: August 18, 2015AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: August 25, 2015!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: August 31, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: August 26, 2015ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RECEIPT | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | !MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.