Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with Thomas W. Lowe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2016 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage, Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
(PROPOSED)ORD GRANT PLTF' MTN FOR NONSUIT W/PREJ
Date: May 31, 2019LTR/KRUGLER TO JDG RE:MEDIATION UNRESOLVED
Date: May 26, 2017PLTF'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOT OF FILING AFFDTS
Date: January 31, 2017DEFN'S CONTROVERTING AFFDT OF RYAN ROBINSON DC, AS TO TANIA ENRRIQUES
Date: July 01, 2016DOCKET SHEET
Date: May 31, 2019***ORD GRANT PLTF'S MTN FOR NONSUIT W/ PREJ
Date: May 31, 2019PLTF' MTN FOR NONSUIT W/PREJ
Date: May 31, 2019LTR FROM THE CT RE: TRIAL SET WK OF 06/03/2019
Date: April 30, 2019LTR FROM THE CT RE:(STANDBY)10/30/18 PRETRIAL PROCEDURES
Date: October 25, 2018(PROPOSED) DEFN' JURY QUESTIONS & INSTRUCTIONS
Date: October 22, 2018DEFN' WITNESS LIST
Date: October 22, 2018DEFN' EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 22, 2018DEFN' MTN IN LIMINE
Date: October 22, 2018(PROPOSED) ORD ON UNOPPOSED MTN FOR CONT
Date: June 27, 2018*(SIGNED 6/29/18)ORD MTN FOR CONT(TRL WK 10/29/18)
Date: July 09, 2018UNOPPOSED MTN FOR CONT
Date: June 27, 2018*ORD ON UNOPPOSED MTN FOR CONT(TRIAL WK OF 7/9/18)
Date: March 14, 2018DEFN 1ST AMD ANS
Date: February 23, 2018DEFN DESG OF PORTIONS OF VIDEO DEPO TESTIMONY
Date: February 20, 2018(PROPOSED)ORD UNOPPOSED MTN CONT
Date: February 16, 2018UNOPPOSED MTN FOR CONT (C/N)
Date: February 16, 2018CERT/DEPO (CRAIG R. DUBOIS MD) $930.10-DEFN
Date: January 22, 2018VAC LTR DAVID KASSABIAN
Date: January 26, 2018VAC LTR RYAN E ROGERS
Date: December 11, 2017LTR/KASSABIAN RE:DEPO OF REP OF REGENERATIVE ORTHOSPINE INST OF TX PA
Date: September 11, 2017***ORD ON AGRD MTN FOR CONT (TRIAL WK OF 3/5/18) &REQ FOR SPEC/SETTING
Date: July 14, 2017(PROPOSED)AGRD ORD CONT & REQ SPECIAL SETTING
Date: July 13, 2017AGRD MTN CONT & REQ SPECIAL SETTING
Date: July 13, 2017CERT/DEPO (BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD TX)$294.34-DEFN
Date: June 06, 2017CERT/DEPO (TX HEALTH HARRIS HOSP FW/MED)$416.75-DEFN
Date: June 08, 2017VAC LTR DAVID KASSABIAN
Date: May 29, 2017CERT/DEPO (FW HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS)$423.43-DEFN
Date: May 05, 2017CERT/DEPO(AMERICAN SERVICE INS AGENCY)$92.10-DEFN
Date: May 19, 2017*** ORD TRANSFER TO COURT# 236***
Date: March 16, 2017***1ST AMD AGRD SCHEDULING ORD***
Date: March 16, 2017***AGRD ORD OF CONT WK OF 8/28/17***
Date: March 16, 2017NOT OF SVC OF COUNTER-AFFDTS
Date: March 02, 2017(PROPOSED)1ST AMD AGRD SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 28, 2017***ORDER OF RECUSAL***
Date: January 31, 2017(PROPOSED) ORD OF CONT
Date: February 28, 2017LTR TO CT/D.KASSABIAN/RE: 1ST AMD AGD SCHED ORD
Date: February 28, 2017(PROPOSED) ORD OF CONTINUANCE
Date: January 30, 2017(PROPOSED)AMD AGRD SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 30, 20171ST AGRD MTN FOR CONT
Date: February 28, 2017***ORD OF ASSIGNMENT (HONORABLE TOM LOWE)***
Date: February 06, 2017LTR/DAVID RASSABIAN/RE: AMD AGRD SCHED ORD
Date: January 30, 2017PLTF'S NOT OF FILING AFFDTS
Date: January 30, 2017AGRD MTN FOR CONT
Date: January 30, 2017(PROPOSED)ORD SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL
Date: January 19, 2017***ORD SUBSTITUTIONG COUNSEL***
Date: January 20, 2017DEFN'S MTN FOR SUB COUNSEL
Date: January 19, 2017CERT DEPO/ELENA GUROVA M.D./282.00/DEFN
Date: November 08, 2016CERT DEPO/TANIA ENRRIQUES/432.10/DEFN
Date: October 26, 2016CERT DEPO/MID-CITIES IMAGING LLP/225.96/DEFN
Date: August 16, 2016VAC LTR/MATERNAITY LEAVE(MAYELLA GONZALEZ)
Date: September 28, 2016CERT DEPO/COMPREHENSIVE SPINE/310.24/DEFN
Date: August 16, 2016***AGRD SCHED ORDER(JURY TRIAL WK 4/17/17)***
Date: May 26, 2016CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY (DEFN)
Date: April 29, 2016(PROPOSED) AGRD SCHED ORD
Date: May 23, 2016LTR OF UNAVAILABILITY (MAYELLA GONZALEZ)
Date: April 29, 2016LTR/M.GONZALEZ (REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL)
Date: April 29, 2016(ORIG ANS) DEFN MICHAEL CHERKASSKY'S ORIG ANS
Date: April 29, 2016CIT Tr# 6 RET EXEC(MICHAEL CHERKASSKY) On 04/07/2016
Date: April 12, 2016(MANUALLY FILE-MARKED) RTURND CIT ON: MICHAEL CHERKASSKY
Date: April 12, 2016(NO FILE-MARK) RETURND CIT ON: MICHAEL CHERKASSKY (SEE TRANS # )
Date: April 12, 2016PLTF'S ORIG PET & REQ FOR DISC
Date: March 15, 2016CIVIL INFO SHEET
Date: March 15, 2016CIT-ISSUED ON MICHAEL CHERKASSKY-On 03/16/2016
Date: March 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PAPER REC DESTROYED | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED)ORD GRANT PLTF' MTN FOR NONSUIT W/PREJ | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ***ORD GRANT PLTF'S MTN FOR NONSUIT W/ PREJ | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | PLTF' MTN FOR NONSUIT W/PREJ | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | LTR FROM THE CT RE: TRIAL SET WK OF 06/03/2019 | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | LTR FROM THE CT RE:(STANDBY)10/30/18 PRETRIAL PROCEDURES | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) DEFN' JURY QUESTIONS & INSTRUCTIONS | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFN' WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.