Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2017 |
CategoryModification-Custody |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
INVENTORY/APPRAISEMENT OF ISMAEL PALOMINOS
Date: June 18, 2018(PROPOSED) EMPLOYERS ORD W/H EARNINGS FOR C/S
Date: December 12, 2018MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: January 04, 2019RECORDS OF CHILD SUPPORT
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 12/11/2018
Date: December 11, 2018CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET
Date: August 11, 2017Citation-ISSUED ON ISMAEL OROSCO PALOMINOS-On 08/11/2017
Date: August 11, 2017ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: August 11, 2017T.R.O. Tr# 8 RET EXEC(ISMAEL OROSCO PALOMINOS) On 08/12/2017
Date: August 15, 2017MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONF
Date: September 29, 2017TRO/ORDER SETTING HEARING-8/24/17 @ 10AM
Date: August 11, 2017ROCS (PROPOSED)
Date: January 04, 2018ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: August 24, 2017NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WOP ON 11/28/2018 Image ID 4712 Signed 10/01/2018
Date: October 01, 2018MOTION TO SUB COUNSEL-R KLINE
Date: March 06, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING-3/16/18 @ 830AM
Date: February 26, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - 12/10/18 @ 9AM
Date: November 28, 2018MOTION TO ENTER
Date: October 09, 2018NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM DISMISSAL DOCKET
Date: November 28, 2018SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: August 11, 2017AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE
Date: December 10, 2018TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: January 22, 2018T.R.O.-ISSUED ON ISMAEL OROSCO PALOMINOS. H/R 08/24/2017 - 10:00-On 08/11/2017
Date: August 11, 2017PRETRIAL CONF ORDER- 7/19/18 @ 9AM
Date: March 16, 2018ORDER ON MOTION TO SUB COUNSEL- RICHARD KLINE
Date: March 08, 2018DOCKET SHEET
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR C/S (CC:C/S)
Date: January 22, 2018RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: August 24, 2017W/H ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 04, 2018RESP'S ORIGINAL ANSWER- I. PALOMINOS
Date: August 24, 2017TEMPORARY ORDERS (PROPOSED)
Date: January 04, 2018ORDER ON MOTION SUB COUNSEL (PROPOSED)
Date: March 06, 2018AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE(PROPOSED)
Date: October 09, 201810 DAY LETTER
Date: January 04, 2018EMPLOYERS ORDER W/H FROM EARRINGS FOR C/S (CC:C/S)
Date: December 19, 2018DRO DOMESTIC RELATIONS OFFICE NOTICE
Date: July 29, 2020AUSTIN FORM
Date: December 10, 2018(PROP) AGREED TEMP ORDS FOR MOD OF PCR (E-LY)
Date: October 15, 2020(PROP) IWO (E-LY)
Date: October 15, 2020COUNTER-PET TO MOD PCR
Date: October 15, 2020AGREED TEMPORARY ORDER FOR MODIFICATION OF PARENT - CHILD RELATIONSHIP
Date: October 16, 2020SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS & ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: September 11, 2020LETTER TO COURT
Date: October 15, 20201ST AMEND PET TO MOD PCR
Date: September 11, 2020SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: August 17, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION TO MODIFY PCR
Date: July 20, 2020EXHIBIT A
Date: July 29, 2020MOTION TO ENTER
Date: January 28, 2020Citation Tr# 71 RET EXEC(SONIA PALOMINOS) On 08/19/2020
Date: August 24, 2020MOT FOR TEMP ORDS
Date: October 15, 2020Citation-ISSUED ON SONIA PALOMINOS-On 08/17/2020
Date: August 17, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING -3/27/20 @9A/MOT TO ENTER QDRO
Date: March 03, 2020(ATTACHED) EXHIBIT A
Date: January 04, 2019(ATTACHED) EXHIBIT B
Date: January 04, 2019(ATTACHED) EXHIBIT C
Date: January 04, 2019FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (ATTACHED)
Date: January 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING -2/22/19 @ 9AM
Date: February 13, 2019MOTION TO ENTER
Date: January 18, 2019QUALIFIED DOMESTICE RELATIONS ORDER 1.28.20 CH
Date: January 28, 2020REFORMED AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE
Date: March 08, 2019(PROPOSED) REFORMED AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE(E-LY)
Date: March 08, 2019SERVICE RETURN
Date: August 15, 2017PARTIAL MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: July 10, 2018PETITIONER'S SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 11, 2017RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: October 12, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED TEMPORARY ORDER FOR MODIFICATION OF PARENT - CHILD RELATIONSHIP | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT (CC:CS) | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | (PROP) AGREED TEMP ORDS FOR MOD OF PCR (E-LY) | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | (PROP) IWO (E-LY) | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | COUNTER-PET TO MOD PCR | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOT FOR TEMP ORDS | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #80 | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS & ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | 1ST AMEND PET TO MOD PCR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.