Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2017 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage, Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
RTN MAIL ON LINX LTD/UNABLE TO FWD
Date: September 14, 2017ORD ON PLTF'S NOT NONSUIT W/O PREJ
Date: December 20, 2018ORD GRANT AGRD MTN TO ABATE
Date: February 09, 2018AGRD MTN TO ABATE
Date: February 09, 2018ORD GRANT LEAVE TO DESIG RESP 3RD PARTIES (RTND UNSIGNED)
Date: November 16, 2017RTN MAIL-LINX LTD-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED/UNABLE TO FWD
Date: November 09, 2017***ORD ON PLTF'S NOT OF NONSUIT W/O PREJ*** (COSTSINCURRED)
Date: December 20, 2018LTR FROM ATTY JAMES A TATEM TO JUDGE WILKINSON
Date: August 23, 2018*ORD GRANT AGRD MTN TO ABATE* (6 MONTHS)
Date: February 09, 2018PLTF'S NOT OF NONSUIT W/O PREJ
Date: December 20, 2018REQ FOR CITS AND PAYMENT OF ADDITIONAL COPIES
Date: May 19, 2017* ORD SET CASE FOR SCHED CONF * (09/26/18 @ 3 PM)
Date: August 15, 2018RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: December 01, 2017LTR FROM M VERONICA NEGRON
Date: October 06, 2017ORD ON PLTF'S NOT OF NONSUIT W/O PREJ
Date: October 20, 2017CIT Tr# 5 RET EXEC(INTERLINE BRANDS INC) On 06/06/2017
Date: July 20, 2017*ORD SET CASE FOR SCHED CONF* (10/23/17 @9AM)
Date: September 06, 2017AGRD SCHED ORD
Date: October 06, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: December 20, 2018* AMD ORD SET CASE SCHED CONF * (01/07/19 @ 9 AM)
Date: August 28, 2018DEFN INTERLINE BRANDS INC'S ORIG ANS
Date: June 28, 2017* AGRD SCHED ORD * (JURY TRIAL WK OF 07/16/18)
Date: October 23, 2017DEFN INTERLINE BRANDS INC'S MTN FOR LEAVE TO DESIGRESP 3RD PARTIES
Date: November 16, 2017*ORD ON PLTF'S NOT OF NONSUIT W/O PREJ*
Date: October 20, 2017PLTF'S NOT OF NONSUIT W/O PREJ
Date: October 20, 2017AFFDT OF SVC ON INTERLINE BRANDS INC.
Date: July 20, 2017CIT-ISSUED ON INTERLINE BRANDS INC-On 05/22/2017
Date: May 19, 2017SERVICE REQ FORM
Date: May 19, 2017CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET
Date: May 19, 2017DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 07, 2017CIT Sec of St-ISSUED ON WATTS REGULATOR CO-On 05/22/2017
Date: May 19, 2017CIT Sec of St-ISSUED ON LINX LTD-On 05/22/2017
Date: May 19, 2017PLTF'S ORIG PET & REQ FOR DISCLOSURE
Date: May 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ORD ON PLTF'S NOT NONSUIT W/O PREJ | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ***ORD ON PLTF'S NOT OF NONSUIT W/O PREJ*** (COSTSINCURRED) | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | PLTF'S NOT OF NONSUIT W/O PREJ | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ABATEMENT LIFTED | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | * AMD ORD SET CASE SCHED CONF * (01/07/19 @ 9 AM) | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | LTR FROM ATTY JAMES A TATEM TO JUDGE WILKINSON | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | * ORD SET CASE FOR SCHED CONF * (09/26/18 @ 3 PM) | |
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ABATEMENT STAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.