Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Campbell-Morris, Destiny, Schoolcraft, Brayden, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Permanency Report to the Court
Date: July 11, 2022Affidavit
Date: July 13, 2022Permanency Hearing Order
Date: May 06, 2022ICWA Documents
Date: May 05, 2022Notice of Change of Payee
Date: April 08, 2022Family Service Plan
Date: April 08, 2022Order Retaining Suit on Court's Docket
Date: March 31, 2022Permanency Report to the Court
Date: March 22, 2022Kinship Caregiver Home Assessments
Date: March 11, 2022Travel Authorization
Date: February 11, 2022Temporary Orders
Date: February 08, 2022Permanency Report to the Court
Date: January 07, 2022Permanency Report to the Court
Date: December 31, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: October 26, 2021Out of State Travel
Date: December 22, 2021Permanency Hearing Order
Date: October 25, 2021Certificate of Paternity Registry Search
Date: October 07, 2021Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Date: October 07, 2021Status Hearing Order
Date: June 16, 2021Permanency Report to the Court
Date: September 16, 2021Original Answer
Date: September 17, 2021Order
Date: June 07, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: June 04, 2021Temporary Orders
Date: June 03, 2021Visitation Plan
Date: June 01, 2021Child Caregiver Resource Form
Date: June 01, 2021Statutory Written Statement
Date: June 01, 2021Family Service Plan
Date: May 25, 2021Department of Defense
Date: April 29, 2021Affidavit
Date: April 22, 2021Order
Date: April 21, 2021Family Service Plan
Date: April 20, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: April 20, 2021Visitation Plan
Date: April 14, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: April 19, 2021Notification Regarding Consent for Medical Care
Date: April 14, 2021Placement Confirmation
Date: April 14, 2021Notice Returned Served
Date: April 08, 2021Statutory Written Statement
Date: April 13, 2021Citation Returned Served
Date: April 08, 2021Notification Regarding Consent for Medical Care
Date: April 07, 2021Notice
Date: April 06, 2021Citation
Date: April 06, 2021Request for Citation
Date: April 05, 2021Order for Temporary Appointment of Ad Litems for Parents
Date: April 05, 2021Discovery Control Plan
Date: April 05, 2021Scheduling Order
Date: April 05, 2021Order for Protection of a Child in an Emergency and Notice
Date: April 05, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: April 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 08/16/2022 Reset by Court to 09/13/2022 | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
TPD Signed Affidavit Affidavit |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanency Report to the Court | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Permanency Hearing Before Final Order Permanency Hearing Order |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
ICWA Notice - Carter Schoolcraft ICWA Documents |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
CHANGE OF PAYEE Notice of Change of Payee |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Plan of Service for Brayden Family Service Plan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.