Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Anderson, Jenny Rebecca, Simpson, Jason Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Order
Date: June 03, 2021Statutory Written Statement
Date: June 01, 2021Order of Termination
Date: May 27, 2021Amended Motion
Date: April 01, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: March 15, 2021Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: January 14, 2021Letter to Court
Date: January 05, 2021Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: December 10, 2020Order
Date: December 10, 2020Statutory Written Statement
Date: December 08, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: December 07, 2020Letter
Date: December 04, 2020Mediated Settlement Agreement
Date: December 02, 2020Order
Date: August 27, 2020Order For Drug Testing
Date: August 27, 2020Statutory Written Statement
Date: August 24, 2020Order to Consolidate
Date: July 30, 2020Order Retaining Suit on Court's Docket
Date: July 30, 2020Motion
Date: July 22, 2020Order For Drug Testing
Date: May 14, 2020Order
Date: May 12, 2020Statutory Written Statement
Date: May 11, 2020Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: April 16, 2020Order to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: February 13, 2020Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel
Date: January 24, 2020Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Date: January 14, 2020Original Answer
Date: January 08, 2020Order
Date: November 11, 2019Request
Date: November 01, 2019Order
Date: October 17, 2019Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: October 17, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: October 07, 2019Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: October 03, 2019Statutory Written Statement
Date: October 03, 2019Scheduling Order
Date: September 24, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: September 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notification Regarding Consent for Medical Care | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STATUTORY WRITTEN STATEMENT Order |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
06.01.2021 Statutory Written Statement Statutory Written Statement |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Termination | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Casa Court Report | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanency Report To the Court | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.