Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ec Tyler Housing Partners, Ltd., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by P. William Stark, against Graham, Terry, Graham, Trey, Terry Graham Interests, Ltd, Winn, Todd Charles, represented by Jason M Jung, Steven W. Comte, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Kennedy, Christi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKennedy, Christi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order of Dismissal
Date: July 16, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 07, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 11, 2019Order of Dismissal
Date: March 13, 2019Letter From 114th
Date: February 20, 2019Motion
Date: January 31, 2019Amended Motion
Date: January 31, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: January 18, 2019Amended Motion
Date: January 11, 2019Motion
Date: January 09, 2019Order
Date: October 16, 2018Answer
Date: September 21, 2018Request
Date: August 22, 2018Motion
Date: September 12, 2018Motion
Date: August 22, 2018Answer
Date: August 22, 2018Motion to Substitute Counsel
Date: August 15, 2018Amended Motion
Date: June 29, 2018Motion
Date: March 07, 2018Answer
Date: February 14, 2018Counter Petition
Date: January 18, 2018Order
Date: January 11, 2018Amended Motion
Date: January 04, 2018Answer
Date: December 07, 2017Counter Petition
Date: September 06, 2017Mediator's Report
Date: October 23, 2017Amended Motion
Date: August 29, 2017Letter
Date: August 16, 2017Order
Date: August 22, 2017Answer
Date: August 15, 2017Order
Date: July 31, 2017Answer
Date: July 21, 2017Answer
Date: July 18, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: July 21, 2017Motion for Leave
Date: June 29, 2017RESPONSE
Date: June 19, 2017Amended Motion
Date: April 05, 2017RESPONSE
Date: April 10, 2017Letter
Date: February 21, 2017Amended Motion
Date: February 14, 2017Answer
Date: January 06, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal Order of Dismissal Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Hearing Not Needed CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Kennedy, Christi) Hearing Not Needed 03/19/2018 Reset by Court to 03/18/2019 Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Order of Dismissal Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Hearing Not Needed CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Kennedy, Christi) Hearing Not Needed Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Hearing Not Needed CANCELED Motion Hearing (2:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Kennedy, Christi) Hearing Not Needed Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Letter Letter From 114th Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Submission Date
Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.