Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carr, Robert, Franklin, Individually, Clifford, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael E. Pierce, against Andrews Cleaning Service, Johnson, Benjamin Kyle, represented by Ryan D. Martin, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Russell, Kerry L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell, Kerry L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2016 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order of Dismissal
Date: June 30, 2020Order Partial Non-Suit
Date: February 19, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 19, 2020Amended Scheduling Order
Date: August 29, 2019Order for Continuance
Date: August 29, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: August 26, 2019Amended Scheduling Order
Date: April 23, 2019Order for Continuance
Date: April 22, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: April 12, 2019Amended Scheduling Order
Date: October 17, 2018Order for Continuance
Date: October 12, 2018Designation of Fact And/Or Expert Witnesses
Date: September 14, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: October 08, 2018Original Answer
Date: July 11, 2018Scheduling Order
Date: June 21, 2018Original Answer
Date: February 08, 2018Order Partial Non-Suit
Date: March 26, 2018Counter Petition
Date: February 20, 2018Request
Date: December 14, 2016Request
Date: December 15, 2016Letter
Date: December 06, 2016Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Vacation
Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order of Dismissal Order of Dismissal Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Partial Dismissal Order Partial Non-Suit Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Dismissal Motion to Dismiss Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter
Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Russell, Kerry L) Agreed Resolution 01/14/2019 Continued to 05/13/2019 - Case Not Ready - Andrews Cleaning Service; Carr, Robert; Franklin, Individually, Clifford; Johnson, Benjamin Kyle 05/13/2019 Continued to 09/23/2019 - Case Not Ready - Andrews Cleaning Service; Carr, Robert; Franklin, Individually, Clifford; Johnson, Benjamin Kyle 09/23/2019 Continued to 01/13/2020 - Case Not Ready - Andrews Cleaning Service; Carr, Robert; Franklin, Individually, Clifford; Johnson, Benjamin Kyle Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Russell, Kerry L) 01/04/2019 Continued to 05/03/2019 - Case Not Ready - Andrews Cleaning Service; Carr, Robert; Franklin, Individually, Clifford; Johnson, Benjamin Kyle 05/03/2019 Continued to 09/13/2019 - Case Not Ready - Andrews Cleaning Service; Carr, Robert; Franklin, Individually, Clifford; Johnson, Benjamin Kyle 09/13/2019 Continued to 01/03/2020 - Case Not Ready - Andrews Cleaning Service; Carr, Robert; Franklin, Individually, Clifford; Johnson, Benjamin Kyle Result: Case Settled
Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Third Amended Scheduling Order Amended Scheduling Order Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion for Continuance Order for Continuance Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.