Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jre Management, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kalandra N. Wheeler, against Gcp Clinical Trial Consultants, Inc., represented by Gwendolyn Simpson, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Scharlene W. Valdez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScharlene W. Valdez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2023 |
CategoryOther Contract - Under $250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Jury Trial
Date: November 06, 2023Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: August 07, 2023E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: May 09, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: June 06, 2023Original Answer
Date: May 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
CCL6 - Docket Control Order Jury Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Scharlene) Judge: Valdez, Scharlene |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Amended Answer and Counterclaim Cross Action/Counterpetition |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
CCL6 - Docket Control Order Docket Control Order |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Original Answer |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff JRE Management, LLC's Original Petition & Jury Demand E-Filed Original Petition Document |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Requested | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.