Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wing, Stephanie Lynn, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Wing, Cody Russell, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Riley, Jack M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship - Conservatorship, Access, Support |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Notice of Nonsuit
Date: July 13, 2023Proposed Order
Date: May 23, 2023Answer
Date: May 23, 2023Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: July 13, 2023Notice
Date: May 23, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: May 23, 2023Affidavit
Date: May 09, 2023Return of Service
Date: May 16, 2023Request For Service
Date: May 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Granting Nonsuit Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on the Motion to Dismiss Suit and Plea to Jurisdiction Proposed Order Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Contingent on the Motion to Dismiss and Plea to Jurisdiction Answer Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Notice of Hearing on the Motion to Dismiss and Plea to Court's Jurisdiction Notice Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Suit and Plea to Jurisdiction Motion (No Fee) Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation-Cody Russell Wing Return of Service Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CitationWing, Cody RussellServed05/15/2023Returned05/15/2023
Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petitioner's Supporting Affidavit Affidavit Judge: Riley, Jack M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.