Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barrow, Alec, Barrow, Andrew, Barrow, Jay D., Barrow, Nancy Wagner, The Nancy Wagner Barrow Children'S Trust, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Other Civil - Over $250,000 case represented by David A. Bryant, Jr., against Koudelka-Clark, Kelly Denise, Seiler, Kenna, Seiler Mitby, Pllc, represented by Zandra Foley, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: June 28, 2023Notice of Nonsuit
Date: June 28, 2023Original Answer
Date: May 11, 2023Amended Petition
Date: April 04, 2023Designation
Date: February 17, 2023Designation
Date: February 15, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: January 25, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: January 24, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: January 11, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 11, 2023Response
Date: December 13, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 13, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 07, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 02, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 07, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: December 02, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 02, 2022Designation
Date: October 19, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: September 07, 2022Designation
Date: August 30, 2022Order of Assignment
Date: April 21, 2022Original Answer
Date: March 24, 2022Request For Service
Date: February 17, 2022E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: February 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) () Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) () Case Disposed03/06/2023Reset by Court to 03/06/202303/06/2023Reset by Court to 07/31/2023 Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Notice of Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition Original Answer Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Amended Petition Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Designation of Experts Designation Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Supplemental Designation of Experts Designation Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order - Email Confirmation No Fee Documents Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.