Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Frf, Inc., Trail Blazer Builders Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Case >$200,000 case represented by James J Burnett, against April Sound Property Owners Association, represented by Caitlin Booker, Rick Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Kristin Bays presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin Bays Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Case >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
|
Order of Abatement/Stay/Arbitration (OCA)
Date: September 08, 2023Bench Trial
Date: October 02, 2023Docket Control Order
Date: May 30, 2023Amended Filing
Date: June 05, 2023Order for Continuance
Date: May 26, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: March 13, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: May 11, 2023Notice
Date: March 03, 2023Signed Order
Date: February 07, 2023Bench Trial
Date: February 21, 2023Letters
Date: January 26, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: February 06, 2023Letters
Date: January 11, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 06, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: January 06, 2023Signed Order
Date: August 31, 2022Summary Judgment
Date: August 26, 2022Proposed Order
Date: August 18, 2022Affidavit
Date: August 18, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: August 18, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: August 11, 2022Response
Date: August 18, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: August 11, 2022Signed Order
Date: August 10, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: August 10, 2022Letters
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Submission
Date: August 03, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 28, 2022Notice of Representation
Date: July 01, 2022Amended Filing
Date: May 16, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: May 16, 2022Affidavit
Date: May 13, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: March 04, 2022Signed Order
Date: May 16, 2022Notice
Date: May 13, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: May 13, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: May 13, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: May 13, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: March 02, 2022Order for Continuance
Date: March 03, 2022Submission
Date: January 28, 2022Signed Order
Date: January 29, 2022Letters
Date: January 27, 2022Response
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 12, 2022Proposed Order
Date: January 12, 2022Motion for Discovery
Date: January 12, 2022Submission
Date: January 07, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: January 04, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Submission
Date: December 21, 2021Designation
Date: December 20, 2021Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 22, 2021No Fee Documents
Date: October 28, 2021Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 12, 2021Response
Date: November 03, 2021Rule 11
Date: October 29, 2021Proposed Order
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 05, 2021Response
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 29, 2021Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 29, 2021Original Answer
Date: August 09, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: August 12, 2021Motion for Default Judgment
Date: August 09, 2021Request For Service
Date: June 16, 2021Request For Service
Date: June 08, 2021Amended Petition
Date: June 14, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: June 08, 2021Answer
Date: August 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Reset Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Other06/12/2023Reset by Court to 10/02/2023 |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Abating Case Except for Dispositive Motion Matters and Setting Status Conference Order of Abatement/Stay/Arbitration (OCA) |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment CANCELED Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Passed |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's First Amended Designation of Expert Witnesses Amended Filing |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.