Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Frank, Chad, Frank, Kerri, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mark Rubal, against Tawse, Amber, represented by Sophia M George, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Kristin Bays presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin Bays Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
CategoryInj/Damage-Motor Vehicle >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Entry
Date: September 29, 2023Notice
Date: January 13, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: May 23, 2023Notice
Date: January 18, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: January 11, 2023Notice
Date: April 25, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 09, 2023Order to Appoint
Date: January 10, 2023Notice
Date: January 09, 2023Settlement Agreements
Date: January 09, 2023Amended Filing
Date: January 06, 2023Notice
Date: January 06, 2023Jury Trial
Date: January 09, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: January 06, 2023Rule 11
Date: January 09, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 06, 2023Notice
Date: December 21, 2022Proposed Order
Date: January 05, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: January 05, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 20, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: January 05, 2023Signed Order
Date: December 21, 2022No Fee Documents
Date: December 20, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 20, 2022Notice
Date: December 20, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 13, 2022Amended Answer
Date: December 19, 2022Notice
Date: December 19, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 15, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 15, 2022Signed Order
Date: December 14, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: December 13, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: July 12, 2022Signed Order
Date: July 09, 2022Designation
Date: March 30, 2022Certificate
Date: June 30, 2022Letters
Date: January 31, 2022Letters
Date: January 13, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: June 30, 2022Letters
Date: May 19, 2022Order for Continuance
Date: December 17, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: December 16, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: December 17, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: July 02, 2021Notice
Date: May 14, 2021Certificate
Date: December 16, 2021Letters
Date: May 13, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: July 07, 2021Designation
Date: April 16, 2021Signed Order
Date: July 07, 2021Notice
Date: May 03, 2021Certificate
Date: February 11, 2021Amended Answer
Date: January 08, 2021Designation
Date: March 18, 2021Original Answer
Date: December 28, 2020Certificate
Date: March 08, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: December 29, 2020Return of Service
Date: December 07, 2020Request For Service
Date: November 19, 2020E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: November 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Oral Deposition Kerri Frank May 4, 2022 Certificate of Deposition |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Notice |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance of Guardian Ad Litem Notice |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant Notice |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Guardian Ad Litem - Email Confirmation No Fee Documents |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Order to Appoint |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Proposed Order |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.