Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Vinet, Terra, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brad Beers, against Mckenzie, Colin Donald, Mckenzie, Louise Margaret, represented by Richard D Weaver, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryInj/Damage-Other Injury Or Damage >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Appeal - Opinion
Date: October 24, 2019Appeal - Mandate
Date: January 03, 2020Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: October 28, 2019Appeal - Correspondence
Date: September 24, 2019Appeal - Correspondence
Date: September 04, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 27, 2019Appeal - Correspondence
Date: August 22, 2019Appeal - Bill of Cost
Date: August 22, 2019Answer
Date: August 15, 2019Signed Order
Date: August 18, 2019Answer
Date: May 31, 2019Response
Date: August 14, 2019Signed Order
Date: August 15, 2019Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: June 28, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: June 20, 2019Proposed Order
Date: June 20, 2019Amended Petition
Date: June 19, 2019Signed Order
Date: May 31, 2019Answer
Date: May 29, 2019Signed Order
Date: April 01, 2019Signed Order
Date: March 15, 2019Letters
Date: May 15, 2019Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: May 13, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 13, 2019Answer
Date: May 13, 2019Signed Order
Date: May 01, 2019Signed Order
Date: April 07, 2019Letters
Date: February 20, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 27, 2018Motion (No Fee)
Date: August 27, 2019Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Appeal
Date: August 22, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: June 20, 2019Amended Filing
Date: May 31, 2019No Fee Documents
Date: May 30, 2019Notice
Date: May 24, 2019Request For Service
Date: April 08, 2019Request For Service
Date: January 02, 2019Appeal - Correspondence
Date: October 24, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal
Date: August 21, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 16, 2019Motion (No Fee)
Date: August 16, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 14, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 24, 2019Answer
Date: May 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Mandate- appeal dismissed Appeal - Mandate Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit of all Claims with Prejudice Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Opinion Letter from COA; Memorandum Opinion Appeal Dismissed Appeal - Opinion Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Correspondence Letter from COA; Judgment Appeal Dismissed Appeal - Correspondence Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Correspondence-Ltr from the 9th coa Re- Appellant's motion for extension of time on brief g Appeal - Correspondence Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Correspondence-Ltr from the 9th coa-Re- Clerk's Record (1 Vol.) filed Appeal - Correspondence Judge: Bays, Kristin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.