Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Edgefield Holdings Llc, Woodforest National Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Josh M. Harrison, Todd M. Feldman, against Luft, Todd Loring, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin, Jennifer J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Subpoena
Date: December 14, 2022Notice
Date: November 28, 2022Vacated Order
Date: November 10, 2022Order Vacating Previous Order
Date: November 08, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: November 01, 2022Notice
Date: October 28, 2022Subpoena
Date: October 26, 2022Subpoena
Date: October 11, 2022Writ of Execution
Date: September 22, 2022Request
Date: September 21, 2022Notice
Date: September 20, 2022Intra-County Court Transfer Order
Date: September 20, 2022Abstract of Judgement
Date: September 15, 2022Request For Service
Date: September 14, 2022Notice
Date: September 14, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 14, 2022Abstract of Judgement
Date: May 31, 2019Bench Trial
Date: October 28, 2019Request
Date: May 21, 2019Docket Control Order
Date: March 04, 2019Default Judgment
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Submission
Date: March 04, 2019Affidavit
Date: February 28, 2019Certificate
Date: February 28, 2019E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: December 26, 2018Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 28, 2019Return of Service
Date: February 13, 2019Request For Service
Date: December 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Subpoena - UBS Financial Services, Inc Subpoena |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum Notice |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
VACATED Order on Motion to Substitute Edgefield Holdings, LLC as Real Party in Interest Vacated Order |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Signed Order on Edgefield Holdings, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Edgefield Hold Order Vacating Previous Order |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Substitute Edgefield Holdings, LLC as Real Motion (No Fee) |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum - PrimeLending Ventures LLC Notice |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Executed Subpoena - Central Bank Subpoena |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Executed Subpoena - PrimeLending, a PlainsCapital Company Subpoena |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.